Kosher Eats LLC et al v. Welch et al
Utah District Court | |
Judge: | Dustin B Pead |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00520 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Jul 25, 2024 1:12 PM MDT |
Defendant
Simone Montoya
|
|
Defendant
David Reeves
|
|
Defendant
William Randall
|
|
Defendant
Peter Pierce
|
|
Defendant
Frank Perretta
|
|
Defendant
Julian Pardo de Zela
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan Owens
|
|
Defendant
Katherine Otto
|
|
Defendant
Ann Nguyen
|
|
Defendant
Christina Mundy
|
|
Defendant
Kathleen Mowry
|
|
Defendant
Richard Reice
|
|
Defendant
Bruce Montoya
|
|
Defendant
Scott Monroe
|
|
Defendant
Ian Mitchell
|
|
Defendant
Caleb Meyer
|
|
Defendant
Messner Reeves LLP
|
|
Defendant
Bryant Messner
|
|
Defendant
Jason Martinez
|
|
Defendant
Marjorie Kratsas
|
|
Defendant
Steven Knauss
|
|
Defendant
Deanne Stodden
|
|
Defendant
Jon Zimmerman
|
|
Defendant
Douglas Wolanske
|
|
Defendant
Karie Wilson
|
|
Defendant
Torben Welch
|
|
Defendant
Andrew Welch
|
|
Defendant
Wade Warthen
|
|
Defendant
Benjamin Tietgen
|
|
Defendant
Jenny Thornton
|
|
Defendant
Matthew Sullivan
|
|
Defendant
Darren Alberti
|
|
Defendant
John Stevens
|
|
Defendant
Heather Stern
|
|
Defendant
Aaron Soleimani
|
|
Defendant
Rowan Smith
|
|
Defendant
Greg Sitrick
|
|
Defendant
Mikhail Shah
|
|
Defendant
Edwin Schwartz
|
|
Defendant
Heather Salg
|
|
Defendant
Adam Royval
|
|
Defendant
Cynthia Carucci
|
|
Defendant
Patrick Drake
|
|
Defendant
Brieanna Dolmage
|
|
Defendant
Allison Dodd
|
|
Defendant
Matthew Deenihan
|
|
Defendant
Erica Deatherage
|
|
Defendant
Isaac Crum
|
|
Defendant
Kimberley Cronin
|
|
Defendant
Gregory Cohen
|
|
Defendant
Laura Chartrand
|
|
Defendant
Charles Cavanagh
|
|
Defendant
Dara Keller
|
|
Defendant
Kathleen Carter
|
|
Defendant
Edgar Carranza
|
|
Defendant
Valerie Bromley
|
|
Defendant
Jake Brigham
|
|
Defendant
Brett Boon
|
|
Defendant
Amber Blasingame
|
|
Defendant
Alex Beltz
|
|
Defendant
Brenda Bartels
|
|
Defendant
Kate Bailey
|
|
Defendant
R.J. Ertmer
|
|
Defendant
Daniel Klett
|
|
Defendant
Idin Kashefipour
|
|
Defendant
Maclain Joyce
|
|
Defendant
Matt Jedrzejek
|
|
Defendant
Craig Humphrey
|
|
Defendant
Amy Huff
|
|
Defendant
Andrew Hollins
|
|
Defendant
Scott Hawranek
|
|
Defendant
Michelle Harden
|
|
Defendant
Margaret Gray
|
|
Defendant
Deanna Gilbertson
|
|
Defendant
Matthew George
|
|
Defendant
Austin Gemmell
|
|
Defendant
Mary Bryne Fletcher
|
|
Defendant
Renne Finch
|
|
Defendant
Rachel Farr
|
|
Plaintiff
HomePeople Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
MSC Companies, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Kosher Eats LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Emerald Consulting Partners LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Abbson LLC
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
157 | 157
notice
Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment
Thu 08/29 11:36 AM
NOTICE OF PRESIDING MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail to the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice emailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Abbson LLC, Emerald Consulting Partners LLC, HomePeople Corporation, Kosher Eats LLC, MSC Companies, LLC, Defendants Darren Alberti, Kate Bailey, Brenda Bartels, Alex Beltz, Amber Blasingame, Brett Boon, Jake Brigham, Valerie Bromley, Edgar Carranza, Kathleen Carter, Cynthia Carucci, Charles Cavanagh, Laura Chartrand, Gregory Cohen, Kimberley Cronin, Isaac Crum, Erica Deatherage, Matthew Deenihan, Allison Dodd, Brieanna Dolmage, Patrick Drake, R.J. Ertmer, Rachel Farr, Renne Finch, Mary Bryne Fletcher, Austin Gemmell, Matthew George, Deanna Gilbertson, Margaret Gray, Michelle Harden, Scott Hawranek, Andrew Hollins, Amy Huff, Craig Humphrey, Matt Jedrzejek, Maclain Joyce, Idin Kashefipour, Dara Keller, Daniel Klett, Steven Knauss, Marjorie Kratsas, Jason Martinez, Bryant Messner, Messner Reeves LLP, Caleb Meyer, Ian Mitchell, Scott Monroe, Bruce Montoya, Simone Montoya, Kathleen Mowry, Christina Mundy, Ann Nguyen, Katherine Otto, Jonathan Owens, Julian Pardo de Zela, Frank Perretta, Peter Pierce, William Randall, David Reeves, Richard Reice, Adam Royval, Heather Salg, Edwin Schwartz, Mikhail Shah, Greg Sitrick, Rowan Smith, Aaron Soleimani, Heather Stern, John Stevens, Deanne Stodden, Matthew Sullivan, Jenny Thornton, Benjamin Tietgen, Wade Warthen, Andrew Welch, Torben Welch, Karie Wilson, Douglas Wolanske, Jon Zimmerman. Form due by 9/19/2024. (mh) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
156 | 156
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Entry of Default Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Order on Motion to Withdraw
Mon 08/26 12:07 PM
ORDER granting 154 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for All Defendants to 9/20/2024; granting Stipulated MOTION 154 to Withdraw Motions for Entry of Default 146 , 147 , 148 , 149 , 150 and 151 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/26/2024. (alf) |
|
notice
Notice From the Court
Mon 08/26 11:56 AM
NOTICE FROM THE COURT re154 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, and Stipulated MOTIONS to Withdraw: Please note that leave a court is not necessary to withdraw a motion. Please use the event Withdrawal of Motion. No further action is needed, for future reference only. (alf) |
||
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
154 | 154
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer Withdraw
Fri 08/23 10:52 AM
Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, , Stipulated MOTION to Withdraw150 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Daniel Klett ,149 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Brieanna Dolmage ,147 MOTION for Entry of Default as to William Randall ,148 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Scott Monroe ,146 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Richard Reice ,151 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Edgar Carranza filed by Defendants Darren Alberti, Kate Bailey, Brenda Bartels, Alex Beltz, Amber Blasingame, Brett Boon, Jake Brigham, Valerie Bromley, Edgar Carranza, Kathleen Carter, Cynthia Carucci, Charles Cavanagh, Laura Chartrand, Gregory Cohen, Kimberley Cronin, Isaac Crum, Erica Deatherage, Matthew Deenihan, Allison Dodd, Brieanna Dolmage, Patrick Drake, R.J. Ertmer, Rachel Farr, Renne Finch, Mary Bryne Fletcher, Austin Gemmell, Matthew George, Deanna Gilbertson, Margaret Gray, Michelle Harden, Scott Hawranek, Andrew Hollins, Amy Huff, Craig Humphrey, Matt Jedrzejek, Maclain Joyce, Idin Kashefipour, Dara Keller, Daniel Klett, Steven Knauss, Marjorie Kratsas, Jason Martinez, Bryant Messner, Messner Reeves LLP, Caleb Meyer, Ian Mitchell, Scott Monroe, Bruce Montoya, Simone Montoya, Kathleen Mowry, Christina Mundy, Ann Nguyen, Katherine Otto, Jonathan Owens, Julian Pardo de Zela, Frank Perretta, Peter Pierce, William Randall, David Reeves, Richard Reice, Adam Royval, Heather Salg, Edwin Schwartz, Mikhail Shah, Greg Sitrick, Rowan Smith, Aaron Soleimani, Heather Stern, John Stevens, Deanne Stodden, Matthew Sullivan, Jenny Thornton, Benjamin Tietgen, Wade Warthen, Andrew Welch, Torben Welch, Karie Wilson, Douglas Wolanske, Jon Zimmerman.(Call, Keith) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order on Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to the Complaint and Stipulated Motion to Withdraw Motions for Default | ||
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
153 | 153
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/22 2:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Keith A. Call on behalf of Darren Alberti, Kate Bailey, Brenda Bartels, Alex Beltz, Amber Blasingame, Brett Boon, Jake Brigham, Valerie Bromley, Edgar Carranza, Kathleen Carter, Cynthia Carucci, Charles Cavanagh, Laura Chartrand, Gregory Cohen, Kimberley Cronin, Isaac Crum, Erica Deatherage, Matthew Deenihan, Allison Dodd, Brieanna Dolmage, Patrick Drake, R.J. Ertmer, Rachel Farr, Renne Finch, Mary Bryne Fletcher, Austin Gemmell, Matthew George, Deanna Gilbertson, Margaret Gray, Michelle Harden, Scott Hawranek, Andrew Hollins, Amy Huff, Craig Humphrey, Matt Jedrzejek, Maclain Joyce, Idin Kashefipour, Dara Keller, Daniel Klett, Steven Knauss, Marjorie Kratsas, Jason Martinez, Bryant Messner, Messner Reeves LLP, Caleb Meyer, Ian Mitchell, Scott Monroe, Bruce Montoya, Simone Montoya, Kathleen Mowry, Christina Mundy, Ann Nguyen, Katherine Otto, Jonathan Owens, Julian Pardo de Zela, Frank Perretta, Peter Pierce, William Randall, David Reeves, Richard Reice, Adam Royval, Heather Salg, Edwin Schwartz, Mikhail Shah, Greg Sitrick, Rowan Smith, Aaron Soleimani, Heather Stern, John Stevens, Deanne Stodden, Matthew Sullivan, Jenny Thornton, Benjamin Tietgen, Wade Warthen, Andrew Welch, Torben Welch, Karie Wilson, Douglas Wolanske, Jon Zimmerman (Call, Keith) |
|
152 | 152
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Thu 08/22 2:08 PM
ORDER granting 145 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Troy Robert Rackham for Kate Bailey, Alex Beltz, Jake Brigham,Valerie Bromley, Laura Chartrand, Isaac Crum, Erica Deatherage, Allison Dodd, R.J. Ertmer, Rachel Farr, Mary Bryne Fletcher,Austin Gemmell, Matthew George, Margaret Gray, Michelle Harden, Scott Hawranek, Amy Huff, Matt Jedrzejek, Maclain Joyce, Idin Kashefipour, Dara Keller, Steven Knauss, Marjorie Kratsas, Jason Martinez, Bryant Messner, Messner Reeves LLP, Caleb Meyer, Ian Mitchell, Bruce Montoya, Simone Montoya, Katherine Otto, Jonathan Owens, Julian Pardo de Zela, Peter Pierce,Adam Royval, Heather Salg, Edwin Schwartz, Greg Sitrick, Rowan Smith, John Stevens, Deanne Stodden, Matthew Sullivan, Jenny Thornton, Benjamin Tietgen, Andrew Welch, Torben Welch and Douglas Wolanske. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.A Pro Hac Vice Attorney who fails to register for CM/ECF access will not receive notifications of electronic filings. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/22/2024. (alf) |
|
151 | 151
motion
Entry of Default
Thu 08/22 3:33 AM
MOTION for Entry of Default as to Edgar Carranza filed by Plaintiffs Abbson LLC, Emerald Consulting Partners LLC, HomePeople Corporation, Kosher Eats LLC, MSC Companies, LLC.(Chase, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
150 | 150
motion
Entry of Default
Thu 08/22 3:32 AM
MOTION for Entry of Default as to Daniel Klett filed by Plaintiffs Abbson LLC, Emerald Consulting Partners LLC, HomePeople Corporation, Kosher Eats LLC, MSC Companies, LLC.(Chase, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
149 | 149
motion
Entry of Default
Thu 08/22 3:31 AM
MOTION for Entry of Default as to Brieanna Dolmage filed by Plaintiffs Abbson LLC, Emerald Consulting Partners LLC, HomePeople Corporation, Kosher Eats LLC, MSC Companies, LLC.(Chase, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
148 | 148
motion
Entry of Default
Thu 08/22 3:30 AM
MOTION for Entry of Default as to Scott Monroe filed by Plaintiffs Abbson LLC, Emerald Consulting Partners LLC, HomePeople Corporation, Kosher Eats LLC, MSC Companies, LLC.(Chase, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
147 | 147
motion
Entry of Default
Thu 08/22 3:28 AM
MOTION for Entry of Default as to William Randall filed by Plaintiffs Abbson LLC, Emerald Consulting Partners LLC, HomePeople Corporation, Kosher Eats LLC, MSC Companies, LLC.(Chase, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
146 | 146
motion
Entry of Default
Thu 08/22 3:27 AM
MOTION for Entry of Default as to Richard Reice filed by Plaintiffs Abbson LLC, Emerald Consulting Partners LLC, HomePeople Corporation, Kosher Eats LLC, MSC Companies, LLC.(Chase, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order |