Dillon v. Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, The
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Donovan W Frank |
Referred: | Douglas L Micko |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02959 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Jul 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 08, 2024 5:57 AM CDT |
Defendant
Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, The
|
|
Plaintiff
Tressy Dillon
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 09/04 8:00 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Tressy Dillon. Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, The waiver sent on 8/28/2024, answer due 10/28/2024. (Scanlon, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 07/25 4:10 PM
Summons Issued as to Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, The. (ABR) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Thu 07/25 4:09 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko. Please use case number 24-cv-2959 (DWF/DLM). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ABR) |
|
1 | 1
8
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/25 2:29 PM
COMPLAINT against Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, The (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11219233) filed by Tressy Dillon. Filer requests summons issued. (Scanlon, Joseph) Modified text on 7/25/2024 (ABR) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |