California Spine And Neurosurgery Institute v. Carpenters Health And Welfare Trust Fund For California, Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Eumi K Lee |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-04493 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A. |
Case Filed: | Jul 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Jul 25, 2024 2:13 PM PDT |
Defendant
Carpenters Health And Welfare Trust Fund For California, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
California Spine And Neurosurgery Institute
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Dismiss
Fri 09/06 4:19 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) filed by Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund for California, Inc.. Responses due by 9/20/2024. Replies due by 9/27/2024.(Angulo, Zachary) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Thu 08/08 11:56 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 10/23/2024. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 11/6/2024 at 01:30 PM before Judge Eumi K. Lee. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lrt, COURT STAFF) |
|
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 08/08 8:58 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to District Judge Eumi K Lee for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case, except for discovery purposes. (smc, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Wed 08/07 4:25 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint, TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund for California, Inc.. (Perkins, Roberta) |
|
12 | 12
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Wed 08/07 4:16 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jhf, COURT STAFF) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Wed 08/07 1:53 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund for California, Inc... (Perkins, Roberta) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom
Tue 08/06 11:01 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING 10/29/24 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2024 is continued to 11/12/2024 09:30 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Case Management Statement due by 11/5/2024. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/svk] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Mon 08/05 10:21 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by California Spine and Neurosurgery Institute re1 Complaint,7 Summons Issued,5 Proposed Summons,4 Certificate of Interested Entities,6 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge,8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines,2 Civil Cover Sheet (Hakakian, Mina) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Fri 07/26 12:03 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/22/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2024 09:30 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. (krp, COURT STAFF) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/26 11:41 AM
Summons Issued as to Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund for California, Inc. (krp, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Thu 07/25 2:50 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by California Spine And Neurosurgery Institute.. (Hakakian, Mina) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Proposed Summons
Thu 07/25 2:06 PM
Proposed Summons. (Hakakian, Mina) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Thu 07/25 1:55 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by California Spine And Neurosurgery Institute re1 Complaint,2 Civil Cover Sheet (Hakakian, Mina) |
|
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 07/25 1:54 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/8/2024. (smc, COURT STAFF) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 07/25 1:48 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by California Spine And Neurosurgery Institute . (Hakakian, Mina) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/25 1:41 PM
COMPLAINT against Carpenters Health And Welfare Trust Fund For California, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19659145.). Filed by California Spine And Neurosurgery Institute.(Hakakian, Mina) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit |