Mehdizadeh v. Starbucks Corporation d/b/a Starbucks Coffee Company
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Wendy Beetlestone |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03339 |
Nature of Suit | 320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jul 25, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Delaware County Court of Common Pleas, CV-24-05484 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 06, 2024 7:01 AM EDT |
Defendant
APOTHECARY SERVICES, INC.
|
|
Defendant
STARBUCKS CORPORATION
2401 UTAH AVENUE SOUTH
SOUTH SEATTLE, WA 98134 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
THE AMERICAN PROSPECT
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
THE NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew Mehdizadeh
1030 E. Lancaster Avenue Suite 630
Bryn Mawr, PA 19010 |
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
106 | 106
misc
Letter
Fri 09/06 4:16 PM
Letter dated September 6, 2024 by STARBUCKS CORPORATION. (MARKEY, NINA) |
|
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
105 | 105
3
pgs
respm
Memorandum
Fri 08/30 2:18 PM
Amended Brief in Support re97 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Andrew Mehdizadeh.(lisad, ) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet | ||
104 | 104
3
pgs
respm
Memorandum
Fri 08/30 2:16 PM
Brief in Support re97 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Andrew Mehdizadeh.(lisad, ) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet | ||
102 | 102
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 08/30 10:34 AM
NOTICE of Withdrawal re100 MOTION for Judgment by Andrew Mehdizadeh. Second Submission.(lisad, ) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet | ||
101 | 101
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion
Fri 08/30 10:32 AM
NOTICE of Withdrawal re100 MOTION for Judgment filed by Andrew Mehdizadeh.(lisad, ) Modified on 8/30/2024 (lisad, ) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet |