Lindemann v. CEC Entertainment, Inc. et al
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | William L Campbell, Jr |
Referred: | Barbara D Holmes |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00908 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 25, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Circuit Court for Davidson County, Tennessee, 24C1552 |
Last checked: Thursday Jul 25, 2024 4:12 PM CDT |
Defendant
CEC Entertainment, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CEC Entertainment, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
NNN REIT, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Pamela Lindemann
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Substitute Attorney
Wed 08/14 10:08 AM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Pamela Lindemann. (Richmond, El Shon) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
service
Certificate of Service
Fri 08/02 2:49 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NNN REIT, Inc. re9 Business Entity Disclosure Statement (Cheney, Danielle) |
|
15 | 15
service
Certificate of Service
Fri 08/02 2:48 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NNN REIT, Inc. re8 Answer to Complaint (Cheney, Danielle) |
|
14 | 14
service
Certificate of Service
Fri 08/02 2:45 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NNN REIT, Inc. re7 Notice of Appearance (Cheney, Danielle) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Business Entity Disclosure Statement
Thu 08/01 3:03 PM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CEC Entertainment, LLC. (Miller, Chancey) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Business Entity Disclosure Statement
Thu 08/01 3:02 PM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CEC Entertainment, Inc.. (Miller, Chancey) |
|
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 08/01 3:00 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by CEC Entertainment, LLC.(Miller, Chancey) |
|
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 08/01 2:57 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by CEC Entertainment, Inc..(Miller, Chancey) |
|
misc
Annotation - Deficiency Notice
Thu 08/01 4:48 PM
NOTICE TO FILER re DE#7 ,8 ,9 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include a certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (ch) |
||
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Business Entity Disclosure Statement
Wed 07/31 3:00 PM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by NNN REIT, Inc.. (Cheney, Danielle) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 07/31 2:58 PM
NNN Reit, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint by NNN REIT, Inc..(Cheney, Danielle) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/31 2:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Cheney on behalf of NNN REIT, Inc. (Cheney, Danielle) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 07/29 3:15 PM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 7/29/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (hb) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Case Management Conference
Thu 07/25 3:57 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 10/29/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (mg) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ
Thu 07/25 3:52 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement
Thu 07/25 3:52 PM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Admin Order 217
Thu 07/25 3:51 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (mg) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 07/25 3:47 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CEC Entertainment, Inc., CEC Entertainment, LLC from Circuit Court of Davidson County, TN, case number 24C1552. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNMDC-4127903)(mg) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Pleadings, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Thu 07/25 4:53 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Chancey Randall Miller, Michael Allen Holmes, Jenney Springer Keaty admitted to this court . (mg) |