Taste of Perfection, LLC v. Walker
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Aleta A Trauger |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00907 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal- Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 25, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Davidson County Chancery Court, 24-00781-I |
Last checked: Thursday Jul 25, 2024 4:12 PM CDT |
Defendant
DeMarcus Walker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Taste of Perfection, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 08/19 1:56 PM
REPLY to Response to re7 First MOTION to Dismiss Filed by Defendant Demarcus Walker Filed by Defendant Demarcus Walker filed by DeMarcus Walker. (Wade, Lorraine) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Business Entity Disclosure Statement
Mon 08/12 3:08 PM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Taste of Perfection, LLC.(Elkin, Julie-Karel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - LLC Membership | ||
10 | 10
18
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Support
Mon 08/12 3:05 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of9 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Taste of Perfection, LLC .(Elkin, Julie-Karel) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Declaration of K. White, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Conversations between ToP and Walker team, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex 2 - Honeybook Confirmation of Walker Signature | ||
9 | 9
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 08/12 2:57 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re7 First MOTION to Dismiss Filed by Defendant Demarcus Walker filed by Taste of Perfection, LLC. (Elkin, Julie-Karel) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Thu 08/01 1:20 PM
ORDER: Motion6 to Dismiss DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 08/01/24. (ad) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss
Wed 07/31 11:23 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss Filed by Defendant Demarcus Walker by DeMarcus Walker.(Wade, Lorraine) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Amended Memorandum of Law in support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Walker Declaration | ||
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss
Wed 07/31 10:28 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss Filed by Defendant Demarcus Walker by DeMarcus Walker.(Wade, Lorraine) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Memorandum of Law in support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Walker Declaration | ||
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Case Management Conference
Thu 07/25 3:30 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference is set for 1/27/2025 at 04:00 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (kc) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ
Thu 07/25 3:27 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement
Thu 07/25 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Admin Order 217
Thu 07/25 3:26 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 07/25 3:25 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DeMarcus Walker from Davidson County Chancery Court, case number 24-0781 I. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNMDC-4127749)(kc) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit State Summons and Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Tennessee Secretary of State for TOP, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Proof of Plaintiff's Citizenship, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Notice of Removal filed with State Court, | ||
Att: 5 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Thu 07/25 3:29 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Julie-Karel Elkin, Lorraine Wade admitted to this court . (kc) |