Dalton v. Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Jerry W Blackwell |
Referred: | John F Docherty |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02974 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12181 Americans with Disabilities Act - Private Entities Definitions |
Case Filed: | Jul 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Jul 25, 2024 5:10 PM CDT |
Defendant
Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Julie Dalton
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 08/13 4:36 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc. answer due 9/23/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 8/13/2024. (TJS) |
|
7 | 7
respm
Proposed Order to Judge re Motion
Tue 08/13 9:38 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Julie Dalton.(Throndset, Chad) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 08/13 9:37 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Julie Dalton. (Throndset, Chad) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 08/06 10:17 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julie Dalton. Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc. served on 8/1/2024, answer due 8/22/2024. (Michenfelder, Patrick) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order/Notice to Attorney
Mon 07/29 12:44 PM
ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. Standing Order No. 1. Signed by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 7/29/2024.(DMD) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/26 2:51 PM
Summons Issued as to Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc. (BTX) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Fri 07/26 2:50 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Jerry W. Blackwell per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations, ADA Other) list, referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Please use case number 24-cv-2974 (JWB/JFD). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (BTX) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/25 4:33 PM
COMPLAINT against Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc. (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11220016) filed by Julie Dalton. Filer requests summons issued. (Michenfelder, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |