Katnic-Annis v. Eli Lilly and Company
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03344 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Jul 25, 2024 6:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
Eli Lilly and Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Laura Katnic-Annis
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/26 11:12 AM
Summons Issued as to Eli Lilly and Company. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 7/26/24 (bw) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case
Fri 07/26 9:37 AM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-cv-3344. (sbt) |
||
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
1
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Thu 07/25 5:28 PM
COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR A JURY TRIAL against Eli Lilly and Company ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17626792.), filed by Laura Katnic-Annis.(RUANE, SARAH) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/26/2024 as per Chambers) (va). |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet of Laura Katnic-Annis, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Civil Cover Sheet of Laura Katnic-Annis, | ||
Att: 3 Designation Form of Laura Katnic-Annis |