VERRAGIO, LTD. v. THE ART OF JEWELS AND FINE ART LLC
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas S Hixson |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-04507 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:501 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jul 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Jul 25, 2024 6:05 PM PDT |
Defendant
THE ART OF JEWELS AND FINE ART LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
VERRAGIO, LTD.
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Thu 08/08 3:55 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Thu 08/08 10:38 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Verragio, Ltd... (Guye, Helena) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/29 1:00 PM
Summons Issued as to The Art of Jewels and Fine Art LLC. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
|
8 | 8
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Mon 07/29 12:55 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/31/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/7/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
|
misc
Copyright
Mon 07/29 12:52 PM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding (cc: form emailed to register). (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
||
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Copyright
Fri 07/26 10:47 AM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding A COPYRIGHT (cc: form mailed to register). (Kroll, Howard) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Patent/Trademark Report
Fri 07/26 10:43 AM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding A PATENT OR TRADEMARK (cc: form mailed to register). (Kroll, Howard) |
|
5 | 5
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Fri 07/26 10:43 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/9/2024. (sec, COURT STAFF) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Fri 07/26 10:39 AM
Rule 7.1 Disclosures by VERRAGIO, LTD. re3 Certificate of Interested Entities,1 Complaint,2 Proposed Summons (Kroll, Howard) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Fri 07/26 10:37 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by VERRAGIO, LTD. identifying Other Affiliate Barry Nisguretsky for VERRAGIO, LTD.. re1 Complaint,2 Proposed Summons (Kroll, Howard) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Fri 07/26 9:09 AM
Proposed Summons. (Kroll, Howard) |
|
1 | 1
23
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/26 9:01 AM
COMPLAINT against THE ART OF JEWELS AND FINE ART LLC. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19661767.). Filed by VERRAGIO, LTD..(Kroll, Howard) Modified on 7/26/2024 (fff, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Copyright Regs, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Verragio Crest, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Screenshots, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet |