Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Holly A Brady
Referred: Susan L Collins
Case #: 1:24-cv-00302
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jul 24, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jan 20, 2025 3:28 AM EST
Defendant
Fort Wayne Community Schools
Represented By
Megan M Torres
Beckman Lawson LLP
contact info
Matthew J Elliott
Beckman Lawson LLP
contact info
Mediator
James E O'Connor
Plaintiff
Coshawndra Monek Kelsaw
6500 St. Joe Rd Apt 708
Fort Wayne, IN 46835


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
16 16 discov Request for Production of Documents Wed 10/02 11:09 AM
REQUEST for Production of Documents by Fort Wayne Community Schools.(Torres, Megan)
Related: [-]
15 15 discov Interrogatories Propounded Wed 10/02 11:08 AM
INTERROGATORIES Propounded to Plaintiff by Fort Wayne Community Schools.(Torres, Megan)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
14 14 order Scheduling Order Mon 09/30 1:21 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The Court sets the following deadlines pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b): The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 10/1/2024. The last date for the completion of all fact and expert discovery is 5/9/2025. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from Plaintiff by 3/7/2025; and from Defendant by 4/11/2025. Supplementation under Rule 26(e) due every six weeks until trial. The last date to seek leave of Court to amend the pleadings as to Plaintiff is 10/25/2024; as to Defendant is 11/22/2024. The deadline to file any dispositive motions is 6/20/2025, with any response due 28 days thereafter and any reply due 14 days after the filing of a response, consistent with Local Rule 56-1(b) and (c). The parties have agreed upon James OConnor as mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 9/30/2024. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (sej)
Related: [-]
13 13 minutes Pretrial Conference - Preliminary - customized ddls & hrgs Mon 09/30 12:23 PM
TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 9/30/2024 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Plaintiff appeared pro se. Atty Megan Torres appeared on behalf of Defendant. The11 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except establishment of a trial date). James O'Connor appointed as mediator. Atty Torres to notify mediator by letter, copy to Plaintiff. (FTR 1st floor.)(copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff) (mr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 09/24 3:42 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Fort Wayne Community Schools.(Elliott, Matthew)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting Tue 09/24 10:04 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Elliott, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
10 10 misc Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated Fri 08/23 10:23 AM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff) (mr)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Hearing/Deadlines Fri 08/23 10:22 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/30/2024 10:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. To connect to the conference, Parties should dial 833-568-8864, enter meeting ID: 161 6325 2172#, push # to skip entry of participant ID and enter passcode 039039# at least five minutes before the conference start time. (copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff)(mr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
utility Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 08/15 8:59 AM
***Waiver of Service Deadline terminated. Defendant Fort Wayne Community Schools answer due by 9/27/2024 per DE6 . (ash)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/14 12:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Megan M Torres on behalf of Fort Wayne Community Schools (Torres, Megan)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/14 11:13 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J Elliott on behalf of Fort Wayne Community Schools (Elliott, Matthew) ***Filing error; refiled at8 *** Modified on 8/14/2024 (ace)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Waiver Wed 08/14 11:11 AM
WAIVER by Fort Wayne Community Schools Waiver of Service . (Elliott, Matthew)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/14 11:08 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J Elliott on behalf of All Defendants (Elliott, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service - form will be generated Mon 07/29 10:55 AM
NOTICE of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons sent to Fort Wayne Community Schools. (Copy mailed to FWCS as directed in Order) Waiver of Service due by 8/28/2024. (sej)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order,
Att: 2 Complaint
Thursday, July 25, 2024
3 3 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 07/29 10:53 AM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; DEFERS payment of the filing fee; ORDERS Plaintiff to pay the $350.00 filing fee from any proceeds recovered in this case; and DIRECTS the Clerk to request Waiver of Service from (and, if necessary, the United States Marshal to serve process on) the Defendant, with a copy of this Order and the Complaint, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(d). Signed by Chief Judge Holly A Brady on 7/25/2024. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(sej)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 07/25 12:41 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Coshawndra Monek Kelsaw.(ash)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment
1 1 cmp Pro Se Complaint Thu 07/25 12:38 PM
PRO SE COMPLAINT against Fort Wayne Community Schools, filed by Coshawndra Monek Kelsaw.(ash)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons