Harris v. Dollinger's Motel et al
New York Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Brenda K Sannes |
Referred: | Miroslav Lovric |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00919 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 24, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 01, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 5:22 AM EDT |
Defendant
DM Inn LLC
|
|
Defendant
Dollinger's Motel
|
|
Plaintiff
Javon Harris
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Docket Annotation
Thu 08/01 4:12 PM
Case transferred electronically to Western District of New York pursuant to Order of Transfer dated 8/1/2024. (jdc ) |
|
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order Transferring Case
Thu 08/01 4:08 PM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Western District of New York. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 8/1/2024. (jdc ) |
|
misc
Docket Annotation
Thu 08/01 4:38 PM
Case transferred from New York Northern has been opened in U.S. District Court, Western District of New York as case 1:24-cv-00725, filed 08/01/2024. (see) |
||
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Letter Request/Motion
Mon 07/29 10:34 AM
Letter Motion from Jon L. Norinsberg, Esq. for Javon Harris requesting To transfer venue submitted to Judge Hon. Brenda K. Sannes .(Norinsberg, Jon) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order/Judgment Order transferring venue | ||
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Thu 07/25 2:26 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff is directed to show cause in writing, on or before August 1, 2024, why this action should not be sua sponte transferred to the District Court for the Western District of New York or dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1400(a), 1406(a), because Defendants principal place of business is located there and it appears that the incident alleged in the Complaint took place there. To the extent that Plaintiff agrees that transfer is appropriate, he should submit a proposed transfer order for the Courts consideration. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 7/25/2024. (jdc) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
4
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/25 11:41 AM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Dollinger's Motel and DM Inn LLC (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-6811145) filed by Javon Harris. (kck) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons |