Nowicki v. Commissioner of Social Security
New York Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Daniel J Stewart |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00920 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Jul 24, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 07/25 4:48 PM
TEXT ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 7/25/2024. (egr) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Initial Attorney Appearance - Commissioner
Thu 07/25 11:53 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - COMMISSIONER: Vernon Norwood appearing for Commissioner of Social Security. Social Security Administrative Transcript due by 10/23/2024. (Norwood, Vernon) |
|
5 | 5
misc
G.O. 18 & SSA Case Assignment Form
Thu 07/25 11:16 AM
General Order #18 Issued. (kck) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Consent / Declination Form
Thu 07/25 11:15 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY CONSENT / DECLINATION FORM filed by Joseph Nowicki advising of consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (kck) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 07/25 11:14 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Joseph Nowicki. (kck) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Social Security Identification Form - [LODGED]
Thu 07/25 11:12 AM
Social Security Identification Form [LODGED] [Pursuant to General Order #18, this document has been electronically lodged with the Court. Viewable by case participants and court personnel only, it is not a filed document, therefore is not available for public inspection. Any further distribution or dissemination is prohibited] . (kck) |
|
1 | 1
cmpssa
Complaint - Social Security Appeal
Thu 07/25 11:10 AM
COMPLAINT - Social Security Appeal. [Pursuant to General Order #18, Section B(3), the CM/ECF system will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing to the USAO-NDNY and Regional Counsel for the Social Security Administration. Service of a Complaint along with the Social Security Identification Form will be considered complete only when the three steps in paragraph 2(A), 2(B) and 2(C) of General Order #18 have been completed.] .(kck) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit - Supplement Fee Agreement, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit - Appellate Division Decision AC Denial, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |