BIANUCCI v. RITE AID CORPORATION
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Harvey Bartle, III |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03356 |
Nature of Suit | 380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage |
Cause | 28:1332(d)(5)(B) Diversity of Citizenship under CAFA |
Case Filed: | Jul 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Jul 26, 2024 1:15 AM EDT |
Defendant
RITE AID CORPORATION
|
|
Plaintiff
MARGARET BIANUCCI
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 09/04 11:42 AM
ORDER THAT THE JOINT REQUEST TO ADJOURN THE 9/24/24 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS DENIED. THE REQUIREMENTS OF RULE 26(f) OF THE FRCP ARE STAYED PENDING FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 9/4/24. 9/4/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh) |
|
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Praecipe/Request
Tue 09/03 12:38 PM
Joint Request to Continue September 24, 2024 Status Conference by RITE AID CORPORATION.(MELODIA, MARK) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/20 4:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by BENJAMIN F. JOHNS on behalf of MARGARET BIANUCCI with Certificate of Service(JOHNS, BENJAMIN) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/20 1:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SAMANTHA E. HOLBROOK on behalf of MARGARET BIANUCCI with Certificate of Service(HOLBROOK, SAMANTHA) |
|
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 08/20 11:41 AM
ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF THOMAS E. LOESER, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) (DOC #4 IN C.A. NO. 24-3691 IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 8/20/24. 8/20/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys
Tue 08/20 8:40 AM
ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF CAITLIN F. SALADRIGAS, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 8/19/24. 8/20/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
Mon 08/19 1:50 PM
APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Caitlin F. Saladrigas by RITE AID CORPORATION. ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17682504.).(MELODIA, MARK) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment A (List of Admissions and Certificate of Good Standing) | ||
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
5
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Fri 08/16 3:25 PM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES, APPOINT INTERIM CO-LEAD COUNSEL, AND SET A SCHEDULE FOR THE FILING OF A CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT. THE CASE FILE FOR THE CONSOLIDATED ACTION WILL BE MAINTAINED UNDER MASTER FILE NO. 24-3356 THE COURT WILL HOLD AN IN-PERSON STATUS CONFERENCE WITH COUNSEL ON 9/24/2024 AT 1:30 PM IN COURTROOM 16A BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE HARVEY BARTLE III. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 8/16/24. 8/16/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh) |
|
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys
Thu 08/15 12:27 PM
ORDER THAT THE9 APPLICATION OF MARK H. FRANCIS, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 8/15/24. 8/15/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (mbh) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
Wed 08/14 10:45 AM
APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark H. Francis by RITE AID CORPORATION. ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17672476.).(MELODIA, MARK) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment A (List of Admissions and Certificates of Good Standing) | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 08/14 10:42 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by MARK S. MELODIA on behalf of RITE AID CORPORATION (MELODIA, MARK) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 08/14 10:40 AM
NOTICE by RITE AID CORPORATION re4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appoint Interim Co-Lead Counsel & Set Schedule for Filing of Consolidated Complaint NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION (WILSON, BENJAMIN) |
|
6 | 6
discov
Disclosure Statement Form 7.1
Wed 08/14 10:34 AM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by RITE AID CORPORATION.(WILSON, BENJAMIN) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 08/14 10:33 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by BENJAMIN RICHARD WILSON on behalf of RITE AID CORPORATION (WILSON, BENJAMIN) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Consolidate Cases
Thu 08/08 5:45 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appoint Interim Co-Lead Counsel & Set Schedule for Filing of Consolidated Complaint filed by MARGARET BIANUCCI.Memorandum.(FERICH, ANDREW) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum (in Support of Motion to Consolidate Cases, Appoint Interim Co-Lead Counsel & Set Schedule for Filing of Consolidated Complaint), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 (AW Resume), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 (Laukaitis Law Resume), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 (CPM Resume), | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 (Hausfeld Resume), | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 (Shub & Johns Resume), | ||
Att: 7 Text of Proposed Order (Order Granting Motion to Consolidate Cases, Appoint Interim Co-Lead Counsel) | ||
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 08/01 5:15 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by MARGARET BIANUCCI re: Jesse Whhite served Summons and Complaint upon RITE AID CORPORATION. RITE AID CORPORATION served on 7/31/2024, answer due 8/21/2024. (FERICH, ANDREW) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/26 1:20 PM
Summons Issued as to RITE AID CORPORATION. Forwarded To: Counsel on 7/26/24 (dt) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
41
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Thu 07/25 8:19 PM
COMPLAINT (Class Action) against RITE AID CORPORATION ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17626958.), filed by MARGARET BIANUCCI.(FERICH, ANDREW) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form |