Brown & Brown Insurance Services Inc v. Alliant Insurance Services Inc
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert R Summerhays |
Referred: | David J Ayo |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00995 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 08, 2024 5:54 AM CDT |
Defendant
Alliant Insurance Services Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Brown & Brown Insurance Services Inc
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Saturday, August 31, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement
Sat 08/31 2:39 PM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brown & Brown Insurance Services Inc. (aty,Halverson, Andrew) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/27 4:26 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brown & Brown Insurance Services Inc identifying Corporate Parent Brown & Brown Inc for Brown & Brown Insurance Services Inc. (aty,Halverson, Andrew) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Corporate Disclosure-2nd NOTICE (Form Included)
Tue 08/13 8:33 AM
SECOND NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, re:3 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, sent to Andrew John Halverson on behalf of Brown & Brown Insurance Services Inc. Show Cause Response due by 8/27/2024. (crt,Mitchell, P) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Fri 07/26 8:53 AM
NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Complaint, sent to Andrew John Halverson on behalf of Brown & Brown Insurance Services Inc. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 8/9/2024. (crt,Miletello, A) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Fri 07/26 8:52 AM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Complaint, sent to Andrew John Halverson on behalf of Brown & Brown Insurance Services Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/9/2024. (crt,Miletello, A) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued - All (Form Included)
Fri 07/26 8:50 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alliant Insurance Services Inc. (crt,Miletello, A) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
11
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/25 8:57 PM
COMPLAINT against Alliant Insurance Services Inc with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-6009387) filed by Brown & Brown Insurance Services, Inc.(Attorney Andrew John Halverson added to party Brown & Brown Insurance Services, Inc(pty:pla))(aty,Halverson, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 07/26 8:50 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. (crt,Miletello, A) |