Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 1:24-mj-03474
Case Filed:Jul 24, 2024
Terminated:Aug 09, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jul 26, 2024 3:31 AM EDT
Defendant
Jordan Stone (1)
Represented By
Raymond D'Arsey Houlihan, III
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Noticing FPD-MIA
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kseniya Smychkouskaya
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/10/2024 9:29 PM EDT
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
Arrest of Jordan Stone (yeh0)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs COMPLAINT as to Jordan Stone (1). (br)
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez: Initial Appearance as to Jordan Stone held on 7/24/2024. Detention Hearing set for 7/26/2024 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Preliminary Examination/Arraignment set for 8/7/2024 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Attorney added: Noticing FPD-MIA for Jordan Stone (Digital 14:18:00 ; 14:44:50) It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States obligation to disclose to the defendant all exculpatory evidence- that is, evidence that favors the defendant or casts doubt on the United States case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and ORDERS the United States to do so. The government has a duty to disclose any evidence that goes to negating the defendants guilt, the credibility of a witness, or that would reduce a potential sentence. The defendant is entitled to this information without a request. Failure to disclose exculpatory evidence in a timely manner may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, or sanctions by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez on 7/24/2024. (yeh0)
Related: [-]