Y.Z. et al v. CooperSurgical, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jon S Tigar |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-04475 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 24, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 2:52 AM PDT |
Defendant
CooperSurgical, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Cooper Companies, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
A.A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Y.Z.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
11
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 08/21 7:48 AM
JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE PARTIES' TIME TO RESPOND; ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 12/2/2024. (dms, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Mon 08/19 2:45 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re1 Complaint, to Extend the Parties' Time to Respond filed by CooperSurgical, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc.. (Covington, Jenny) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order Relating Case
Wed 08/07 7:00 PM
ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO DIRECTLY ASSIGN AND RELATE NEWLY FILED CASES AND TO ALLOW PLAINTIFFS TO PROCEED PSEUDONYMOUSLY. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on 05/13/2024. Order relating case pursuant to attached order filed at DOC 66 in Case 24-cv-643. Case 24-cv-4475 is related to Case 24-cv-643. (dms, COURT STAFF) |
|
7 | 7
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing
Wed 08/07 4:16 PM
CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/23/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/30/2024 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at jstcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 10/29/2024 at 2:00PM PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dms, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Thu 07/25 1:06 PM
Summons Issued as to CooperSurgical, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc.. (msr, COURT STAFF) |
|
5 | 5
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Thu 07/25 1:01 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 10/22/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2024 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only.(msr, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Notice Video-Recording | ||
4 | 4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 07/25 11:15 AM
Case assigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (sec, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by A.A., Y.Z. (Sharp, Dena) | |
2 | 2 Proposed Summons. (Sharp, Dena) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against CooperSurgical, Inc., Does 1-10, The Cooper Companies, Inc.. Filed by Y.Z., A.A..(Sharp, Dena) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |