Baidan v. Romanovska
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Virginia K Demarchi |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-04473 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 24, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 2:53 AM PDT |
Defendant
Diana Romanovska
|
|
Plaintiff
Orest Baidan
325 Sharon Park Drive #440
Menlo Park, CA 94025 |
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 08/22 9:18 AM
ORDER re Deadline for Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 8/22/2024. (vkdlc1, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 08/14 5:09 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; Staying Service of Process; and Screening Complaint Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915. Amended complaint due by 9/5/2024. (vkdlc1, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Thu 07/25 4:26 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/15/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2024 01:30 PM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. (krp, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Thu 07/25 4:21 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Orest Baidan. (krp, COURT STAFF) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 07/25 4:20 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Orest Baidan. (krp, COURT STAFF) |
|
1 | 1
26
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/25 4:19 PM
COMPLAINT against Diana Romanovska. Filed by Orest Baidan (In Forma Pauperis pending). Consent/Declination due by 8/7/2024.(krp, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |