Delgado-Fuentes v. NOVO NORDISK A/S et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03373 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Jul 26, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Jul 26, 2024 10:12 AM EDT |
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
800 SCUDDERS MILL ROAD
PLAINSBORO, NJ 08536 |
|
Plaintiff
Jeanette Louise Delgado-Fuentes
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/29 11:48 AM
Summons Issued as to NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC.. Forwarded To: Counsel on 7/29/2024. (ahf) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
55
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Fri 07/26 10:01 AM
COMPLAINT Jeanette Louise Delgado-Fuentes against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17627679.), filed by Jeanette Louise Delgado-Fuentes.(ORENT, JONATHAN) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form | ||
misc
MDL Member Case
Fri 07/26 1:32 PM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-CV-3373. (sbt) |