Creamer et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Terry A Doughty |
Referred: | Kayla D Mcclusky |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00997 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 26, 2024 |
Case in other court: | 26th JDC, Parish of Bossier, C-173307 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 09, 2024 3:32 AM CDT |
Defendant
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Creamer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shawna Creamer
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/13/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 08/01 1:47 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co.(aty,Norris, Meaghan) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Response to Removal Order
Wed 07/31 9:14 AM
RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co . (aty,Norris, Meaghan) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Removal Order
Mon 07/29 3:49 PM
REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 7/29/2024. (crt,Leday, A) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Fri 07/26 11:11 AM
PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/26/2024. (crt,Bunting, M) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement
Fri 07/26 10:37 AM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (aty,Norris, Meaghan) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 07/26 10:35 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (aty,Norris, Meaghan) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 07/26 10:33 AM
NOTICE of All Parties Remaining in This Action by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co re1 Notice of Removal, (aty,Norris, Meaghan) Modified docket text on 7/26/2024 (Bunting, M) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 07/26 10:24 AM
NOTICE of Removal from 26th Judicial District Court, Case Number C-173307 (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-6009665) filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Attorney Meaghan Jeansonne Norris added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft))(aty,Norris, Meaghan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Petition, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Policy, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit State Court Record, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Certificate of Compliance, | ||
Att: 5 Civil cover sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 07/26 11:09 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Bunting, M) |
||
service
State Court Service Returned Executed (Removal Cases)
Fri 07/26 1:07 PM
STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co answer due 8/2/2024. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY - NO PDF ATTACHED, see1 NOTICE of Removal, attachment #3. (crt,Bunting, M) |