JUDKA v. RITE AID CORPORATION
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Harvey Bartle, III |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03381 |
Nature of Suit | 380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Jul 26, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Jul 26, 2024 1:15 PM EDT |
Defendant
RITE AID CORPORATION
|
|
Plaintiff
ERICA JUDKA
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
misc
Remark
Thu 09/05 9:09 AM
PAPER #6 MAILED TO UNREP (JL) |
||
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 09/04 10:14 AM
ORDER THAT JOINT REQUEST TO ADJOURN THE 9/24/24 PRETRIAL CONF IS DENIED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 9/4/24. 9/4/24 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(rf, ) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
misc
Remark
Mon 08/26 10:31 AM
DOC. NO. 5 MAILED TO UNREP ON 8/26/2024. (md) |
||
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
5
pgs
order
Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Mon 08/19 7:43 AM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES, APPOINT INTERIM CO-LEAD COUNSEL, AND SET A SCHEDULE FOR THE FILING OF A CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT. THE CASE FILE FOR THE CONSOLIDATED ACTION WILL BE MAINTAINED UNDER MASTER FILE NO. 24-3356 THE COURT WILL HOLD AN IN-PERSON STATUS CONFERENCE WITH COUNSEL ON 9/24/2024 AT 1:30 PM IN COURTROOM 16A BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE HARVEY BARTLE III. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 8/16/24. 8/16/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 8/16/24. (rf) |
|
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 08/15 9:31 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ERICA JUDKA served Summons and Complaint upon RITE AID CORPORATION. RITE AID CORPORATION served on 8/14/2024, answer due 9/4/2024. (LAUKAITIS, KEVIN) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/30 9:10 AM
Summons Issued as to RITE AID CORPORATION. (rf, ) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 07/26 3:03 PM
NOTICE by ERICA JUDKA (Designation Form) (LAUKAITIS, KEVIN) |
|
1 | 1
41
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Fri 07/26 1:52 PM
COMPLAINT against RITE AID CORPORATION ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17628543.), filed by ERICA JUDKA.(LAUKAITIS, KEVIN) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form | ||
misc
Attorney Required Forms
Fri 07/26 2:57 PM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. PLAINTIFF's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. All Yes/No questions need to be answered. (sbt) |