Colonial Van Lines, Inc. v. Top Rated Moving Van Lines
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Donald M Middlebrooks |
Case #: | 9:24-cv-80912 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Trademark |
Case Filed: | Jul 26, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 09, 2024 4:51 AM EDT |
Defendant
Top Rated Moving Van Lines
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Colonial Van Lines, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Fri 08/30 11:11 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING IN PART7 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant requests an additional thirty days to file its response to Plaintiff's Complaint. In support, Defendant cites that counsel was only retained on August 20, 2024, and needs additional time to respond. Motions for extensions of time must set forth good cause supported by specific facts. The motion does not sufficiently explain the need for a full thirty-day extension. Because it is unopposed, I will grant a short extension, but future motions that lack factual support will be denied. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or by September 12, 2024. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/30/2024. (aad) |
|
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Thu 08/29 4:34 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint, Plaintiff's Complaint by Top Rated Moving Van Lines. Attorney Seth Adam Kolton added to party Top Rated Moving Van Lines(pty:dft). (Kolton, Seth) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Wed 08/14 5:15 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Colonial Van Lines, Inc.. Top Rated Moving Van Lines served on 8/8/2024, response/answer due 8/29/2024. (desRosiers, Kelly Ann) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
misc
Form AO 120/121
Fri 07/26 2:16 PM
FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK. (wce) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint with Logs | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/26 2:15 PM
Summons Issued as to Top Rated Moving Van Lines. (wce) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 07/26 2:15 PM
Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Colonial Van Lines, Inc. (desRosiers, Kelly Ann) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Fri 07/26 2:13 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (wce) |
|
1 | 1
12
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/26 1:49 PM
COMPLAINT against Top Rated Moving Van Lines. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17709762, filed by Colonial Van Lines, Inc. a Florida Corporation.(desRosiers, Kelly Ann) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Summon(s) Summons |