Heise v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Eric C Tostrud |
Referred: | Douglas L Micko |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02980 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Jul 26, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Jul 26, 2024 1:11 PM CDT |
Defendant
The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Heise
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 07/30 12:38 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Christopher Heise. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The waiver sent on 7/26/2024, answer due 9/24/2024.(Strand, Alesia) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/26 1:30 PM
Summons Issued as to Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The. (CLK) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Fri 07/26 1:29 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko. Please use case number 24-cv-2980 ECT/DLM. Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (CLK) |
|
1 | 1
4
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/26 12:48 PM
COMPLAINT against The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11221710) filed by Christopher Heise. Filer requests summons issued. (Strand, Alesia) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |