DIAZ v. ALLIED PHYSICIANS SURGERY CENTER, LLC
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Damon R Leichty |
Referred: | Scott J Frankel |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00610 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim |
Case Filed: | Jul 26, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Jul 26, 2024 3:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
ALLIED PHYSICIANS SURGERY CENTER, LLC
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP One Indiana Square Suite 3500
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GLORIA DIAZ
HKM Employment Attorneys, LLP 320 N. Meridian Street Suite 615
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 08/30 11:17 AM
ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Allied Physicians Surgery Center, LLC.(DeVoe, Thomas) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 08/14 2:10 PM
Pursuant to General Order 2024-22 and the retirement of Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr., this case is now reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel. (ksc) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 07/29 2:04 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Allied Physicians Surgery Center, LLC. (DeVoe, Thomas) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 07/29 10:18 AM
**NEW CASE** Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (kmt) |
||
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 07/26 3:12 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALLIED PHYSICIANS SURGERY CENTER, LLC. (DeVoe, Thomas) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Certificate
Fri 07/26 3:07 PM
CERTIFICATE of Filing of Notice of Removal . (DeVoe, Thomas) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/26 3:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Tristan C Fretwell on behalf of ALLIED PHYSICIANS SURGERY CENTER, LLC (Fretwell, Tristan) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/26 3:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R DeVoe on behalf of ALLIED PHYSICIANS SURGERY CENTER, LLC (DeVoe, Thomas) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 07/26 3:02 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AINNDC-5638464.) from St. Joseph County Superior Court, Cause No. 71D07-2406-PL-000126, filed by ALLIED PHYSICIANS SURGERY CENTER, LLC.(DeVoe, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Record - Complaint, Appearance, Summons, Proof of Service, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
State Court Complaint
Mon 07/29 10:17 AM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Allied Physicians Surgery Center, LLC, filed by Gloria Diaz in St. Joseph Superior Court 71D07-2406-PL-000126.(kmt) |