Hayes v. Bellsouth Telecommunications LLC
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Jerry Edwards, Jr |
Referred: | Mark L Hornsby |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00996 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 26, 2024 |
Case in other court: | 26th JDC Bossier Parish, C-173356E |
Last checked: Monday Sep 09, 2024 3:32 AM CDT |
Defendant
BellSouth Telecommunications L L C
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sally Hayes
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/13/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judges By Consent
Mon 08/12 2:36 PM
NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judges By Consent. If you wish to proceed before the magistrate judge, please complete and return the appropriate form located on this court's website by clicking[LINK:here] . Executed consent forms must be emailed to lawdml_consents@lawd.uscourts.gov. DO NOT return the form to the judges. (crt,Keller, J) |
|
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order Setting Scheduling Conference
Mon 08/12 2:36 PM
ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/23/2024 11:00 AM by phone before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 9/9/2024. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 9/16/2024. Rule 26 Report due by 9/16/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/12/2024. (crt,Keller, J) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/06 9:04 AM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sally Hayes. (aty,Nichols, Jason) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 08/02 12:30 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by BellSouth Telecommunications L L C.(aty,Davidson, Casie) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Removal Order
Mon 07/29 3:49 PM
REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/29/2024. (crt,Keller, J) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Fri 07/26 2:34 PM
PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/26/2024. (crt,Chavis, J) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Fri 07/26 2:32 PM
NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement sent to Jason Blance Nichols on behalf of Sally Hayes. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 8/9/2024. (crt,Chavis, J) |
|
4 | 4
service
Certificate of Service
Fri 07/26 11:46 AM
CORRECTED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re docs1 ,2 ,3 by BellSouth Telecommunications L L C (aty,Hudson, Joshua) Modified docket text on 7/26/2024 (Chavis, J) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement
Fri 07/26 11:03 AM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bellsouth Telecommunications LLC. (aty,Hudson, Joshua) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 07/26 11:01 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bellsouth Telecommunications LLC identifying Other Affiliate BellSouth Mobile Data Inc, Other Affiliate AT&T Wireline Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate AT&T DW Holdings Inc, Other Affiliate AT&T Inc for Bellsouth Telecommunications LLC. (aty,Hudson, Joshua) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 07/26 10:28 AM
NOTICE of Removal from 26th JDC Bossier Parish, Case Number 173356 (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-6009633) filed by Bellsouth Telecommunications LLC.(Attorney Joshua Michael Hudson added to party Bellsouth Telecommunications LLC(pty:dft))(aty,Hudson, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 List of Parties and Pleadings, | ||
Att: 2 State court petition, | ||
Att: 3 State Court Record, | ||
Att: 4 Notcie of Removal from State Court to Federal Court, | ||
Att: 5 Civil cover sheet | ||
service
State Court Service Returned Executed (Removal Cases)
Fri 07/26 2:28 PM
STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. BellSouth Telecommunications L L C answer due 8/2/2024.: ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY:The PDF image can be found inAttachment #3 to Document1 Notice of Removal (crt,Chavis, J) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 07/26 2:31 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge Jerry Edwards, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Chavis, J) |
||
transfer
Divisional Transfer
Fri 07/26 2:38 PM
DIVISIONAL TRANSFER of Old Case Number 1:24-cv-0996 from Alexandria Division to Shreveport Division. New Case Number 5:24-cv-0996. (crt,Chavis, J) |