Scheer v. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Gerald J Pappert |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03394 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 42:4053 Breach of Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 29, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Sep 13, 2024 5:32 AM EDT |
Defendant
STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
One State Farm Plaza
Bloomington, IL 61710 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sally Scheer
640 North Settlers Circle
Warrington, PA 18976 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 09/04 6:34 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, filed by Sally Scheer.(MCGINTY-FERRIS, MARIA) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment Civ Cover, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form Attachment Designation | ||
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 08/23 11:29 AM
ORDER THAT THE STIPULATION TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. NO. 7) IS GRANTED AND PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT BY 9/6/2024. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 8/23/2024. 8/23/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ahf) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation
Thu 08/22 2:34 PM
STIPULATION to File Amended Complaint by Sally Scheer. (MCGINTY-FERRIS, MARIA) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 08/21 6:07 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sally Scheer. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY waiver sent on 8/21/2024, answer due 10/21/2024. (MCGINTY-FERRIS, MARIA) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 08/21 12:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by GARY A. DRAKAS on behalf of STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(DRAKAS, GARY) |
|
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Affidavit of Service
Fri 08/09 1:50 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service re: served Complaint and Summons upon State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company by Certified Mail on 08/05/2024 (SWARTZ, BRANDON) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/30 10:03 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by MARIA K. MCGINTY-FERRIS on behalf of Sally Scheer (MCGINTY-FERRIS, MARIA) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/29 11:39 AM
Summons Issued as to STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 7/29/24 (bw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Mon 07/29 10:21 AM
COMPLAINT 2:24-cv-3394 against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17631039.), filed by Sally Scheer.(SWARTZ, BRANDON) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form |