Donald Ausmus v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-04163 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 26, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 09, 2024 5:51 AM EDT |
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
DuPont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Donald Ausmus
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 07/26 3:05 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 07/26/2024), Donald Ausmus v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-04163-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Western Kentucky (mbon) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/26 3:03 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (mbon) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/26 3:03 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11900492.), filed by Donald Ausmus. Service due by 10/24/2024 (mbon) |