Goldberg v. TeachBK, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Lisa J Cisneros |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-04525 |
Nature of Suit | 320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander |
Case Filed: | Jul 26, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Jul 26, 2024 1:11 PM PDT |
Defendant
Andrei Burtsev
|
|
Defendant
Ilya Kiselev
|
|
Defendant
TeachBK, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Miriam Goldberg
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Thu 08/29 12:36 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Miriam Goldberg of Court Order (Slater, James) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order
Wed 08/28 5:16 PM
ORDER by Judge Lisa J. Cisneros: Defendants' deadlines to file their answers or otherwise respond to the complaint are extended by thirty days. (ljclc1, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 08/27 2:51 PM
NOTICE by Miriam Goldberg of Non-Opposition (Slater, James) |
|
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 08/27 12:51 PM
ORDER by Judge Lisa J. Cisneros: Defendants' 18 Motion to Extend Time to File Answer is denied without prejudice. Generally, pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-1(a), parties may stipulate to extend the time within which to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint without a Court order provided the change will not alter the date of any event or any deadline already fixed by Court order. The stipulation must then be promptly filed with the Court. However, the Court notes that Defendant TeachBK is allegedly a dissolved corporation, and thus cannot appear in this action without representation. The Court therefore directs Plaintiff to file a brief statement indicating whether she opposes extending Defendants' time to file an answer or otherwise respond. This statement of non-opposition is to be filed by August 28, 2024. If Plaintiff does not oppose, the Court intends to issue an order granting the extension. (ljclc1, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 08/23 9:59 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint filed by TeachBK, Inc.. (msr, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 08/14 6:59 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Miriam Goldberg. Andrei Burtsev served on 8/14/2024, answer due 9/4/2024. (Slater, James) |
|
16 | 16
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 08/14 12:04 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Miriam Goldberg. TeachBK, Inc. served on 8/8/2024, answer due 8/29/2024. (Slater, James) |
|
15 | 15
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 08/14 12:03 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Miriam Goldberg. Ilya Kiselev served on 8/8/2024, answer due 8/29/2024. (Slater, James) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/29 4:34 PM
Summons Issued as to Andrei Burtsev, Ilya Kiselev, TeachBK, Inc.. (msr, COURT STAFF) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Proposed Summons
Mon 07/29 12:27 PM
Proposed Summons. (Slater, James) |
|
12 | 12
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Mon 07/29 11:49 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/17/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/24/2024 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (msr, COURT STAFF) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 07/29 7:30 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Miriam Goldberg.. (Slater, James) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Fri 07/26 5:20 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Miriam Goldberg (Slater, James) |
|
9 | 9
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Fri 07/26 3:44 PM
Order by Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros granting 2 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for James Murray Slater.(bns, COURT STAFF) |
|
8 | 8
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Fri 07/26 3:43 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 8/9/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bns, COURT STAFF) |
|
7 | 7
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Fri 07/26 3:19 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/9/2024. (sec, COURT STAFF) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Proposed Summons
Fri 07/26 2:22 PM
Proposed Summons. (Jacobs, Ethan) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Proposed Summons
Fri 07/26 2:20 PM
Proposed Summons. (Jacobs, Ethan) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 07/26 2:18 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by Miriam Goldberg . (Jacobs, Ethan) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons
Fri 07/26 2:14 PM
Proposed Summons. (Jacobs, Ethan) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Fri 07/26 2:02 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19663776.) filed by Miriam Goldberg.(Slater, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/26 12:52 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19663416.). Filed by Miriam Goldberg.(Jacobs, Ethan) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Fri 07/26 2:05 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect Civil Cover Sheet used. Please use our most current version (10/2020) found on our website www.cand.uscourts.gov. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover SheetThis filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re:1 Complaint filed by Miriam Goldberg (ark, COURT STAFF) |
||
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Fri 07/26 3:20 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Please file only one summons. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re:6 Proposed Summons filed by Miriam Goldberg,3 Proposed Summons filed by Miriam Goldberg,5 Proposed Summons filed by Miriam Goldberg (sec, COURT STAFF) |