|
|
order
~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines
Mon 08/26 10:08 AM
[IN-CHAMBERS TEXT ONLY ORDER]: Due to the procedural posture of this case, the Court hereby ORDERS the following: Plaintiff John Taggart must file his motion for default judgment within sixty (60) days from the date of this Order. Additionally, the Court advises Plaintiff that due to the Court's criminal duty month in October 2024 and the resultant calendar congestion, motions filed in civil cases with hearings originally set for October 2024 may have their hearings rescheduled to November 2024 or later at the Court's discretion. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Peter H. Kang on August 26, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (phklc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 08/26 10:16 AM
[IN-CHAMBERS TEXT ONLY ORDER]: Due to the procedural posture of this case, the Initial Case Management Conference, and all associated deadlines, are HEREBY VACATED . The Court will issue a new scheduling order if necessary after further review of the case. It is so Ordered. Signed by Judge Peter H. Kang on August 26, 2024. (phklc1, COURT STAFF) Modified on 8/26/2024 (phklc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Entry of Default
Thu 08/22 3:17 PM
Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to defendant Trove Recommerce, Inc. Related [+](dhm, COURT STAFF)
|
10
|
|
10
motion
Entry of Default
Wed 08/21 11:41 AM
MOTION for Entry of Default filed by John Taggart.(Mandel, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Declaration of Jacqueline Mandel in Support of Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default against Defendant,
|
| |
Att: 2
Supplement Certificate of Service
|
9
|
|
9
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Thu 08/15 8:24 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by John Taggart.. (Mandel, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Wed 08/14 12:40 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 8/28/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jaf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 08/01 7:50 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Taggart. Trove Recommerce, Inc. served on 7/30/2024, answer due 8/20/2024. (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/26 3:28 PM
Summons Issued as to Trove Recommerce, Inc.. (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Fri 07/26 3:23 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/17/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/24/2024 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Fri 07/26 12:21 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/9/2024. (smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
misc
Copyright
Fri 07/26 12:17 PM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding A Copyright (cc: form mailed to register). (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
misc
Proposed Summons
Fri 07/26 12:16 PM
Proposed Summons. (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
9
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/26 12:16 PM
COMPLAINT against Trove Recommerce, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19663269.). Filed by John Taggart.(Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit Original Photograph,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit Infringing Use of Photograph,
|
| |
Att: 3
Civil Cover Sheet
|
|
|
utility
Remark
Fri 07/26 3:35 PM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a copyright (Form AO121) emailed to the Copyright Office. (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|