Perry v. Brookshire Grocery Co et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | David C Joseph |
Referred: | David J Ayo |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-01000 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 26, 2024 |
Case in other court: | 16th Judicial District Court, 94177 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 09, 2024 3:33 AM CDT |
Defendant
Brookshire Grocery Co
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
X Y Z Insurance Co
|
|
Plaintiff
Benjamin Perry
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/06 12:43 PM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Benjamin Perry. (aty,Durio, Lee) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 07/31 10:23 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Brookshire Grocery Co.(aty,Meyers, Andrew) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Response to Removal Order
Wed 07/31 9:46 AM
RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Brookshire Grocery Co .(aty,Meyers, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 State court notice of filing | ||
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 07/31 9:35 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brookshire Grocery Co identifying Corporate Parents, B G C Management Inc, Brookshire Holdings Inc for Brookshire Grocery Co. (aty,Meyers, Andrew) Modified on 7/31/2024 to add corporate parents and modify docket text.(Crick, S) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement
Wed 07/31 9:34 AM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brookshire Grocery Co. (aty,Meyers, Andrew) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Removal Order
Tue 07/30 10:59 AM
REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 7/30/2024. (crt,Chicola, C) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Mon 07/29 9:37 AM
PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/29/2024. (crt,Crick, S) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Mon 07/29 9:13 AM
NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal sent to Andrew H Meyers, Lee C Durio on behalf of Brookshire Grocery Co, Benjamin Perry. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 8/12/2024. (crt,Crick, S) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Mon 07/29 9:12 AM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal sent to Andrew H Meyers on behalf of Brookshire Grocery Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/12/2024. (crt,Crick, S) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 07/26 2:41 PM
NOTICE of Removal from 16th JDC St. Martin Parish, Case Number 094177 (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-6010274) filed by Brookshire Grocery Co.(Attorney Andrew H Meyers added to party Brookshire Grocery Co(pty:dft))(aty,Meyers, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 State court citation, | ||
Att: 2 Civil cover sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 07/29 9:11 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge David C Joseph and Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. (crt,Crick, S) |