Grindstaff v. Wilson County, The et al
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | William L Campbell, Jr |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00914 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 26, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Jul 26, 2024 3:14 PM CDT |
Defendant
Robert C. Bryan
|
|
Defendant
Mike Hale
|
|
Defendant
Joseph Riley Pierce
|
|
Defendant
Wilson County, The
|
|
Plaintiff
Donna Grindstaff
219 Halifax Drive
Dothan, AL 36305 |
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
respoth
Memorandum in Support
Fri 09/06 8:48 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support of7 MOTION to Dismiss New Complaint filed by Robert C. Bryan, Mike Hale, Joseph Riley Pierce, Wilson County, The .(Shannon, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Earlier Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Doc. 099 Order, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Doc. 048 Order, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Doc. 049 Motion to Object, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Doc. 129 Order, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Doc. 136 Objection to Order, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Doc. 144 Order | ||
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss
Fri 09/06 8:41 AM
MOTION to Dismiss New Complaint by Robert C. Bryan, Mike Hale, Joseph Riley Pierce, Wilson County, The. (Shannon, Ryan) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 08/27 9:58 AM
SUMMONS returned executed by Donna Grindstaff. Robert C. Bryan served on 8/19/2024; Mike Hale served on 8/19/2024; Joseph Riley Pierce served on 8/19/2024; Wilson County, The served on 8/19/2024. (am) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 08/27 9:57 AM
MOTION to E-File by Donna Grindstaff. (am) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/26 3:04 PM
Summons issued as to Robert C. Bryan, Mike Hale, Joseph Riley Pierce, Wilson County, The. Completed summons mailed to pro se party. (fee paid) (xc: Pro Se party by regular mail.) (sb) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ
Fri 07/26 2:49 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (sb) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Admin Order 217
Fri 07/26 2:49 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (sb) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/26 2:48 PM
COMPLAINT against Robert C. Bryan, Mike Hale, Joseph Riley Pierce, Wilson County, The (Filing fee $405, Receipt number 300003505), filed by Donna Grindstaff.(sb) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Receipt 3-24-914 | ||
misc
Annotation - Docket
Fri 07/26 3:13 PM
Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (Docket Sheet, Certificate of Service form, and Notice of Consent form included). (sb) |