Parish of St Mary et al v. Lumen Technologies Inc et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert R Summerhays |
Referred: | David J Ayo |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-01001 |
Nature of Suit | 240 Real Property - Torts to Land |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage |
Case Filed: | Jul 26, 2024 |
Case in other court: | 16th JDC for St. Mary Parish, 138575 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 09, 2024 3:33 AM CDT |
Defendant
A T & T Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lumen Technologies Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
City of Franklin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
City of New Iberia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Johnny Gibson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Parish of St Mary
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/13/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 09/05 2:01 PM
Joint MOTION Motion for Entry of Scheduling Order by All Paties by All Defendants. Motions referred to David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/5/2024.(aty,Zuckerman, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order Proposed Order | ||
utility
Motions Transferred
Fri 09/06 9:10 AM
Motions Transferred regarding24 Joint MOTION Motion for Entry of Scheduling Order. Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Crick, S) |
||
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Protective Order
Thu 08/29 2:30 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order with Corrected Stipulated Proposed Protective Order by All Defendants. Motions referred to David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/29/2024.(aty,Zuckerman, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order Corrected Stipulated Proposed Protective Order | ||
22 | 22
motion
Protective Order
Thu 08/29 1:39 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by All Defendants. Motions referred to David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/29/2024.(aty,Zuckerman, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order PROPOSED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER | ||
notice
Notice of Corrective Action
Tue 09/03 8:53 AM
NOTICE of Corrective Action to Adam Bennett Zuckerman on behalf of A T & T Inc, Lumen Technologies Inc regarding22 Joint MOTION for Protective Order . Action taken: Terminated22 Motion for Protective Order.23 Motion for Protective Order resubmitted. (crt,Crick, S) |
||
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Response to Removal Order
Mon 08/26 10:00 AM
RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by A T & T Inc, Lumen Technologies Inc .(aty,Zuckerman, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Record | ||
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 08/19 11:44 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Adam K Levin for Lumen Technologies Inc; granting18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Megan R Nishikawa for Lumen Technologies Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 8/19/2024. (crt,Chicola, C) |
|
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 08/19 11:40 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Robert B Ellis for A T & T Inc; granting14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Hariklia Karis for A T & T Inc; granting15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Jon David Kelley for A T & T Inc; granting16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Mark J Nomellini for A T & T Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 8/19/2024. (crt,Chicola, C) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 08/16 4:14 PM
MOTION for Megan R. Nishikawa to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-6031667) by Lumen Technologies Inc. Motions referred to David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/16/2024.(aty,Pitre, Loulan) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of good standing, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed order | ||
17 | 17
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 08/16 4:03 PM
MOTION for Adam K. Levin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-6031614) by Lumen Technologies Inc. Motions referred to David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/16/2024.(aty,Pitre, Loulan) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of good standing, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed order | ||
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 08/15 4:07 PM
MOTION for Mark J. Nomellini to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-6030439) by A T & T Inc. Motions referred to David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/15/2024.(aty,Zuckerman, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of good standing, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed order | ||
15 | 15
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 08/15 3:45 PM
MOTION for Jon D. Kelley to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-6030377) by A T & T Inc. Motions referred to David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/15/2024.(aty,Zuckerman, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of good standing, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed order | ||
14 | 14
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 08/15 2:28 PM
MOTION for Hariklia Karis to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-6030142) by A T & T Inc. Motions referred to David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/15/2024.(aty,Zuckerman, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of good standing, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed order | ||
13 | 13
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 08/15 12:46 PM
MOTION for Robert B. Ellis to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-6029965) by A T & T Inc. Motions referred to David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/15/2024.(aty,Zuckerman, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of good standing, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed order | ||
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 08/13 1:02 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 8/13/2024. (crt,Crick, S) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 08/12 4:00 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal, with consent by A T & T Inc, Lumen Technologies Inc. Motions referred to David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/12/2024.(aty,Zuckerman, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order | ||
10 | 10
misc
Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement
Mon 08/12 3:57 PM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by A T & T Inc, Lumen Technologies Inc (Attorney Adam Bennett Zuckerman added to party Lumen Technologies Inc(pty:dft)). (aty,Zuckerman, Adam) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement
Mon 08/12 2:53 PM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by City of Franklin, Johnny Gibson, City of New Iberia, Parish of St Mary. (aty,Nelson, Korey) |
|
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 08/09 3:37 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lumen Technologies Inc. (aty,Jackson, Jane) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 08/09 11:34 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by A T & T Inc. (aty,Zuckerman, Adam) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Minute Entry
Thu 08/08 2:08 PM
MINUTE ENTRY: On August 5, 2024, Defendants in Gary Blum, et al. v. AT&T Corp., et al., Case No. 6:23-cv-1748 ("Blum Case"), filed a "Notice of Related Case and Request that the Related Actions be Governed by the Same Deadlines for Remand Issues and Responsive Pleadings." [ECF No. 59]. Within the Notice, Defendants assert that "[g]iven the interrelatedness" of the Blum case and Parish of St. Mary, et al. v. Lumen Technologies, Inc., et al., Case No. 6:24-cv-1001 ("Parish of St. Mary Case"), the latter case "should be governed by the same deadlines for remand issues and responsive pleadings" that have been set this date in the Blum case. Before any court action will be taken with regard to the issue raised by Defendants, counsel in the Parish of St. Mary Case must confer and ascertain whether agreement can be reached on this issue. If counsel cannot reach agreement, Defendants may file an appropriate motion with the Court. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 8/7/2024. (crt,Craig-Fontenot, C) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Removal Order
Tue 07/30 11:00 AM
REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 7/30/2024. (crt,Chicola, C) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Mon 07/29 10:11 AM
PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/29/2024. (crt,Crick, S) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Mon 07/29 10:07 AM
NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal, sent to Adam Bennett Zuckerman, Korey Arthur Nelson, Loulan Joseph Pitre, Jr on behalf of A T & T Inc, City of Franklin, Johnny Gibson, Lumen Technologies Inc, City of New Iberia, Parish of St Mary. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 8/12/2024. (crt,Crick, S) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Mon 07/29 10:05 AM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal sent to Adam Bennett Zuckerman, Loulan Joseph Pitre, Jr on behalf of A T & T Inc, Lumen Technologies Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/9/2024. (crt,Crick, S) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 07/26 3:23 PM
NOTICE of Removal from 16th JDC for St. Mary Parish, Case Number 138575 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-6010382) filed by Lumen Technologies, Inc., AT&T, Inc..(Attorney Adam Bennett Zuckerman added to party AT&T, Inc.(pty:dft))(aty,Zuckerman, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 07/29 10:04 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. (crt,Crick, S) |