Hamparsomian v. First Savings Bank
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | James Donato |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-04540 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Jul 26, 2024 |
Case in other court: | San Francisco County Superior Court, CGC-24-615231 |
Last checked: Friday Jul 26, 2024 4:09 PM PDT |
Defendant
First Savings Bank
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tamar Hamparsomian
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney
Tue 09/03 10:14 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Jason M. Julian on behalf of First Savings Bank (Julian, Jason) |
|
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Fri 08/30 4:15 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by First Savings Bank re14 Reply to Opposition/Response, (Julian, Jason) |
|
14 | 14
respm
Reply to Opposition/Response
Fri 08/30 3:22 PM
REPLY filed byFirst Savings Bank.(Julian, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Janelle J. Sahouria ISO Defendant's Reply ISO Motion to Dismiss | ||
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 08/09 4:34 PM
NOTICE by First Savings Bank re7 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof re-noticing hearing (Sahouria, Janelle) |
|
12 | 12
order
Case Management Scheduling Order
Fri 08/09 8:28 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 10/24/2024.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/9/2024. (lrc, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 08/12 8:04 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to7 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof . Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. (lrc, COURT STAFF) |
||
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 08/08 6:33 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 08/08/2024.(mbc, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Wed 08/07 4:54 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (bxl, COURT STAFF) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Wed 08/07 4:44 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by First Savings Bank.. (Sahouria, Janelle) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Mon 08/05 12:34 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT OR DECLINATION: Defendant First Savings Bank has filed a Motion to Dismiss. Accordingly, Plaintiff and Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 8/12/2024 . Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: [LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bxl, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss
Fri 08/02 6:11 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by First Savings Bank. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 9/23/2024 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. Responses due by 8/16/2024. Replies due by 8/23/2024.(Sahouria, Janelle) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Amanda Almeda Sison, Esq. in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Amanda Almeda Sison Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Amenda Almeda Sison Declaration, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) | ||
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Mon 07/29 3:48 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/21/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/28/2024 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, via Videoconference Only. This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. (slh, COURT STAFF) |
|
5 | 5
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Mon 07/29 12:46 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by First Savings Bank (Sahouria, Janelle) |
|
4 | 4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Mon 07/29 8:39 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/12/2024. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Fri 07/26 3:58 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by First Savings Bank identifying Corporate Parent First Savings Financial Group, Inc. for First Savings Bank. (Sahouria, Janelle) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Fri 07/26 3:55 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by First Savings Bank identifying Corporate Parent First Savings Financial Group, Inc. for First Savings Bank. (Sahouria, Janelle) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 07/26 3:45 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Civil Action by Defendant First Savings Bank from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-24-615231. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-19664536). Filed by First Savings Bank.(Sahouria, Janelle) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Summons, Civil Cover, Complaint, Notice to Plaintiff, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service of Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Julie Bleich in Support of Notice of Removal to Federal Court, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |