C. L. v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Charles R Breyer |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-04542 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 29, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Sep 13, 2024 3:17 AM PDT |
Defendant
Rasier, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Rasier-CA, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Uber Technologies, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
C. L.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Mon 07/29 5:07 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by C. L. Proof of Service of Complaint (Hirsch, Andrea) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/29 3:25 PM
Summons Issued as to Rasier, LLC, Rasier-CA, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (anj, COURT STAFF) |
|
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Mon 07/29 2:08 PM
Case assigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (cjl, COURT STAFF) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Mon 07/29 10:18 AM
Proposed Summons. (Hirsch, Andrea) |
|
1 | 1
6
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/29 10:16 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Rasier, LLC, Rasier-CA, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19667301.). Filed by C. L..(Hirsch, Andrea) Modified on 7/29/2024 (anj, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
MDL Member Case
Mon 07/29 3:18 PM
DIRECT MEMBER CASE OPENED: MDL 3084 Opened in California Northern District as 3:24-cv-04542-CRB cc: JPMDL (anj, COURT STAFF) |