Johnson v. Lara
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Edward J Davila |
Referred: | Pslc Hhl |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-04529 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 26, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Prison Trust Fund Account Statement
Tue 08/13 4:10 PM
Prison Trust Fund Account Statement by LaCedric William Johnson. (mcl, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: CDCR Prisoner IFP Motion
Fri 08/09 12:19 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE: The Clerk has received plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is directed to submit within 72 hours and in PDF form a certified Prison Trust Account statement for the plaintiff, LaCedric William Johnson H28940, reflecting the last six months activity, to cdcrfilings@cand.uscourts.gov. (mcl, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis PSP CDCR
Thu 08/08 2:40 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by LaCedric William Johnson. (mcl, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: IFP
Fri 07/26 3:30 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 9/3/2024. (mcl, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/26 3:29 PM
COMPLAINT against Angel Guevara Lara. Filed by LaCedric William Johnson. (mcl, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
Remark
Fri 07/26 3:53 PM
Copy of docket sheet and2 emailed to SQSP. (mcl, COURT STAFF) |