Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 71.202.130.40
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Laurel Beeler |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-04530 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jul 26, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Jul 26, 2024 5:06 PM PDT |
Defendant
John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 71.202.130.40
|
|
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
7
pgs
order
Order on Ex Parte Application
Wed 08/21 7:34 PM
ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting 8 Ex Parte Application 8 Ex Parte Application for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof . (lblc1, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Ex Parte Application
Tue 08/20 8:41 PM
Ex Parte Application for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-D, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Fri 08/09 4:01 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Mon 07/29 3:39 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/17/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/24/2024 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, via Videoconference Only. (slh, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
Remark
Mon 07/29 3:41 PM
Copy of4 Report emailed to Copyright office (slh, COURT STAFF) |
||
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Fri 07/26 3:48 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/9/2024. (mbc, COURT STAFF) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Copyright
Fri 07/26 3:19 PM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Copyright (cc: form mailed to register).(Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Fri 07/26 3:16 PM
Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Fri 07/26 3:13 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC, Other Affiliate John Doe, Defendant for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/26 3:10 PM
COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 71.202.130.40 ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19664374.). Filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Bandlow, Lincoln) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |