CBD Resources, Inc.
Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Gregory R Schaaf |
Case #: | 7:24-bk-70306 |
Case Filed: | Jul 26, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
CBD Resources, Inc.
PO Box 952
Hyden, KY 41749-0952 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
100 E Vine St #500
Lexington, KY 40507 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 12:00 PM EDT |
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 09/05 3:40 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by John Zachary Garvey Filed by on behalf of Kentucky Energy and Environment Cabinet. (Garvey, John) |
|
20 | 20
trustee
Meeting of Creditors Held
Thu 09/05 2:58 PM
Meeting of Creditors Held Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Nerderman, Bradley) |
|
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
trustee
Meeting of Creditors Continued (Trustee)
Fri 08/30 2:53 PM
Meeting of Creditors Continued by Trustee Filed by U.S. Trustee . 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/5/2024 at 02:00 PM via Zoom via teleconference - ust (Nerderman, Bradley) Pursuant to KYEB LBR 2003-1(a), any required service of the continued meeting date, time and place shall be the responsibility of counsel for the debtor(s) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 08/28 11:14 AM
Certificate of Service, filed by CBD Resources, Inc. . (Langdon, Dean) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 08/27 2:47 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Amelia Martin Adams Filed by on behalf of Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Adams, Amelia) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 08/27 2:19 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Gregory D. Pavey Filed by on behalf of Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Pavey, Gregory) |
|
15 | 15
order
Employ
Tue 08/27 9:35 AM
Order GRANTING Application to Employ DelCotto Law Group PLLC as counsel for debtor (awd) |
|
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 08/23 10:51 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Lance Huffman Filed by on behalf of Kentucky Energy and Environment Cabinet. (Huffman, Lance) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 08/08 12:25 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by T. Kent Barber Filed by on behalf of Penn Virginia Operating Co., LLC. (Barber, T.) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Amended Schedules A-H, Mailing Matrix
Mon 08/05 3:08 PM
Amended Schedule(s) B, F, - Changing the amount of a debt Fee Amount $34 filed by CBD Resources, Inc.. (Langdon, Dean) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Mon 08/05 3:13 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Amended Schedules A-H, Mailing Matrix([LINK 24-70306 grs] ) [misc,amdschat] ( 34.00). Receipt number A11904702, amount $ 34.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Sat 08/03 12:06 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 08/02/2024. (Admin.) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 08/02 4:46 PM
Certificate of Service, filed by CBD Resources, Inc. . (Langdon, Dean) |
|
9 | 9
6
pgs
motion
Employ (Do Not Use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner)
Fri 08/02 9:16 AM
Application to Employ DelCotto Law Group PLLC as Attorney for Debtor. Last day to file objections: 8/23/2024 . (Langdon, Dean) |
|
Att: 1 4 pgs Exhibit A - Declaration | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 08/01 9:56 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Daniel I. Waxman Filed by on behalf of Indemnity National Insurance Company. (Waxman, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11(corporation)
Wed 07/31 2:09 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/30/2024 at 02:00 PM via teleconference. Last day to oppose dischargeability is 10/29/2024. (ksc) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Generic
Tue 07/30 9:38 AM
Order Designating Individual Responsible to Perform Duties of the Debtor (awd) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Operating Order
Mon 07/29 3:33 PM
Chapter 11 Operating Order (awd) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 07/26 5:15 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Bradley M. Nerderman Filed by on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Nerderman, Bradley) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Order Submitted
Fri 07/26 4:38 PM
Proposed Order submitted by Dean A. Langdon on behalf of CBD Resources, Inc.. (Langdon, Dean) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate or Partnership Resolution
Fri 07/26 4:35 PM
Corporate Resolution, filed by CBD Resources, Inc.. (Langdon, Dean) |
|
1 | 1
44
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Fri 07/26 4:29 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount 1738 Filed by CBD Resources, Inc.. (Langdon, Dean) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Fri 07/26 4:37 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-70306 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt number A11894674, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |