Formation Creative Group, LLC v. 9 Kings Hong Kong Limited
New York Northern District Court | |
Judge: | David N Hurd |
Referred: | Christian F Hummel |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00926 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute |
Case Filed: | Jul 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 27, 2024 1:14 AM EDT |
Defendant
9 Kings Hong Kong Limited
|
|
Plaintiff
Formation Creative Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 09/04 2:57 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy J Bryant on behalf of 9 Kings Hong Kong Limited (Bryant, Timothy) |
|
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 09/03 4:17 PM
FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by 9 Kings Hong Kong Limited identifying Other Affiliate All Asset Management (Asia) Limited, Other Affiliate 9 Kings Creative Capital Limited for 9 Kings Hong Kong Limited.. (Haley, Brooke) |
|
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice
Fri 08/30 3:50 PM
Text ORDER granting12 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Timothy J. Bryant, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 8/30/2024. (tab) |
|
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice
Thu 08/29 12:52 PM
MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Timothy J. Bryant Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-6851938. [THIS DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND VIEWABLE BY COURT USERS ONLY] Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Haley, Brooke) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Sponsor Attorney Brooke K. Haley, | ||
Att: 3 Attorney Timothy Bryant E-Filing Registration Form, | ||
Att: 4 Petition for Admission, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Mon 08/19 10:55 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Formation Creative Group, LLC by 9 Kings Hong Kong Limited.(Haley, Brooke) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibits A-F to Counterclaim | ||
utility
Set/Reset Answer Deadline
Mon 08/19 4:02 PM
***Answer due date updated for Counter Defendant Formation Creative Group, LLC answer due 9/9/2024. Answer due date terminated as to 9 Kings Hong Kong Limited. (mmg) |
||
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Admission Requirement
Fri 08/16 10:00 AM
NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party 9 Kings Hong Kong Limited; Attorney Timothy J. Bryant, Email address is tbryant@preti.com. Copy Served via email along with courtesy copy of GO 25. Admissions due by 8/30/2024. (mmg) |
|
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 08/16 9:20 AM
ORDER Approving the #8 Stipulation Accepting Service of Process and Extending Time to Respond to Complaint, filed by Formation Creative Group, LLC. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 8/16/2024. (mmg) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Answer Deadline
Fri 08/16 9:22 AM
***Answer due date updated for 9 Kings Hong Kong Limited answer due 9/24/2024. (mmg) |
||
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation
Thu 08/15 5:17 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint,3 Summons Issued , Accepting Service of Process and Extending Time to Respond to the Complaint until September 24, 2024, by Formation Creative Group, LLC submitted to Judge David N. Hurd. (Morris, Francesca) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/15 1:15 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Arantxa Cuadrado Perez-Broseta on behalf of Formation Creative Group, LLC (Cuadrado Perez-Broseta, Arantxa) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 08/12 1:24 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Formation Creative Group, LLC re5 Notice of Appearance,1 Complaint,2 FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,3 Summons Issued,4 G.O. 25 Filing Order, served on August 7, 2024, on counsel for 9 Kings Hong Kong Limited, Timothy J. Bryant, Preti, Flaherty, Beliveau & Chartered, LLP (Morris, Francesca) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/01 12:37 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Francesca A. Morris on behalf of Formation Creative Group, LLC (Morris, Francesca) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
G.O. 25 Filing Order
Fri 07/26 10:10 AM
G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 10/24/2024 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/17/2024. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (mmg) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/26 10:09 AM
Summons Issued as to 9 Kings Hong Kong Limited. (mmg) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 07/26 10:08 AM
FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Formation Creative Group, LLC. (mmg) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/26 10:07 AM
COMPLAINT against 9 Kings Hong Kong Limited (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-6812803) filed by Formation Creative Group, LLC. (mmg) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Agreement, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |