CHAMBERS v. GLEN MILLS SCHOOLS et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Mark A Kearney |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03250 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 25, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 30, 2024 |
Defendant
DELAWARE COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS/EDUCATION
|
|
Defendant
GLEN MILLS SCHOOL STAFF OF BUCHANAN HALL DURING THE YEARS OF 1994-1997 (1-20) JOHN DOES
|
|
Defendant
GLEN MILLS SCHOOLS
|
|
Defendant
PHILADELPHIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS/EDUCATION
|
|
Defendant
STATE OF CONNECTICUT DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
|
|
Defendant
STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS/EDUCATION
|
|
Plaintiff
ROY CHAMBERS
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Memorandum and/or Opinion Order
Fri 08/30 9:55 AM
ORDER THAT WE DISMISS THE COMPLAINT (ECF NO. 1) AT IT IS OUTLINED HEREIN, AND DIRECT THE CLERK OF COURT TO CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 8/30/24. 8/30/24 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(lisad, ) |
|
9 | 9
11
pgs
order
Memorandum and/or Opinion
Fri 08/30 9:53 AM
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 8/30/24. 8/30/24 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(lisad, ) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
misc
Remark
Wed 08/14 8:07 AM
PAPER #8 MAILED TO PRO SE (JL) |
||
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 08/13 5:08 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S6 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF'S PRO SE REQUEST FOR PAPER COPIES6 IS GRANTED CONSISTENT WITH THE CLERK OF COURT'S PROCEDURE MAILING FILINGS TO PRO SE PARTIES AT THEIR DOCKETED ADDRESS ABSENT A REQUEST FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICE. THE COMPLAINT1 IS DEEMED FILED BUT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL NOT ISSUE SUMMONSES SUBJECT TO FURTHER ORDER AFTER OUR SCREENING OF THE COMPLAINT1 UNDER 28 USC SEC. 1915. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 8/13/24.8/13/24 ENTERED. NOT MAILED TO CHAMBERS.(fdc) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Praecipe/Request
Tue 08/13 12:44 PM
Request for Paper Documents and Electronic File Access by ROY CHAMBERS (envelope attached). (er) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 08/13 12:40 PM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS filed by ROY CHAMBERS.(envelope attached).(er) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
misc
Remark
Tue 07/30 7:50 AM
PAPER #4, #5 AND FORMS MAILED TO PRO SE (JL) |
||
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 07/29 10:19 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S3 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS DENIED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 7/29/24.7/29/24 ENTERED. NOT MAILED TO CHAMBERS.(fdc) |
|
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 07/29 10:00 AM
ORDER THAT 1. Plaintiff shall, on or before August 26, 2024, either: (1) pay $405 filing fee to the Clerk of Court, or (2) move to proceed in forma pauperis;2. The Clerk of Court shall send this Order to Plaintiff along with a copy of the appropriate non-prisoner application to proceed in forma pauperis, bearing the civil action number of this case. Plaintiff may use this form to seek leave to proceed in forma pauperis if he cannot afford to pay the fees to commence this case; 3. No summons shall issue until further Order; and, 4. We may dismiss the case without further notice for failure to prosecute if Plaintiff fails to comply with this Order. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 7/26/24. 7/29/24 ENTERED. NOT MAILED TO CHAMBERS.(fdc) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 07/29 9:45 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by ROY CHAMBERS.(tjd) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice re: Pro Se Guidelines
Fri 07/26 10:34 AM
PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (dt) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/26 10:31 AM
COMPLAINT against DELAWARE COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS/EDUCATION, GLEN MILLS SCHOOL STAFF OF BUCHANAN HALL DURING THE YEARS OF 1994-1997 (1-20) JOHN DOES, GLEN MILLS SCHOOLS, PHILADELPHIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS/EDUCATION, STATE OF CONNECTICUT DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS/EDUCATION, filed by ROY CHAMBERS, JR. (NO FILING FEE OR IFP) (ENVELOPE ATTACHED) (dt) Modified on 7/26/2024 (dt) |
|
misc
Remark
Fri 07/26 10:37 AM
E-Consent to Receive Notice Mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff Roy Chambers. (dt) |