Kroll, LLC v. Leonard
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | William L Campbell, Jr |
Referred: | Barbara D Holmes |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00071 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 27, 2024 3:21 AM CDT |
Defendant
James Leonard, II
|
|
Plaintiff
Kroll, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Stay Withdraw Document
Fri 09/06 5:51 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay of Proceedings Pending Mediation , MOTION to Withdraw Document 18 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Expedited Discovery by Kroll, LLC. (Tom, Robert) |
|
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 08/30 1:59 PM
ORDER: The parties have filed Joint Motion for Enlargement of Time22 regarding the due date for a response set by this Court's Order21 and jointly request that the Court's deadline of August 30, 2024 for Defendant to submit their response to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Discovery18 be enlarged by and through September 6, 2024. Defendant is granted an additional eight (8) day enlargement of time, by and through September 6, 2024. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/30/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 08/30 7:37 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by James Leonard, II.(McKoon, James) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Consent Order | ||
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
2
pgs
order
Order Setting Hearing on Motion ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 08/29 2:20 PM
ORDER: Pending before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Expedited Discovery.18 . Defendant shall file a response to the motion by Friday, August 30, 2024. The Court will hold a hearing on Plaintiff's Motion on Thursday, September 19, 2024, at 2:00 p.m. at the Fred D. Thompson United States Courthouse and Federal Building, 719 Church Street, Nashville, Tennessee, in Courtroom 6B.. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/29/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 08/16 8:20 AM
ORDER granting14 and15 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Rachael Luken Carp and Benjamin S. Levine to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 08/16/2024. (lh) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
28
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Support
Mon 08/12 9:24 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of18 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite MOTION for Discovery filed by Kroll, LLC .(Tom, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Declaration of David Burg (Exhibits A and B), | ||
Att: 2 Attachment Declaration of Brent Tomlinson, | ||
Att: 3 Attachment Declaration of David Rogers (Exhibits A-E), | ||
Att: 4 Attachment Declaration of James Yu (Exhibit A) | ||
18 | 18
motion
Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction Expedite Discovery
Mon 08/12 9:09 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION to Expedite , MOTION for Discovery by Kroll, LLC.(Tom, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Proposed Order - TRO | ||
17 | 17
misc
Declaration
Mon 08/12 5:01 PM
DECLARATION of Benjamin S. Levine filed by James Leonard, II re:15 MOTION for attorney Benjamin S. Levine to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4138207). (McKoon, James) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Declaration
Mon 08/12 5:00 PM
DECLARATION of Racheal Luken Carp filed by James Leonard, II re:14 MOTION for attorney Rachael Luken Carp to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4138204). (McKoon, James) |
|
misc
Annotation - Deficiency Notice
Mon 08/12 10:38 AM
NOTICE TO FILER re DE#14 and15 : This document has been scanned. Documents generated from a word processor (Word or WordPerfect) should NOT be scanned, but rather printed directly to PDF via a PDF writer. Document must be text searchable. You do not have to refile this document, however, future scanned pleadings of this nature may require refiling. (kc) |
||
misc
Annotation - Deficiency Notice
Mon 08/12 10:38 AM
NOTICE TO FILER re DE#14 and15 : By no later than five (5) business days from the date of this docket annotation, the pro hac vice motion must be supplemented by the filing of a statement under oath of the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission disclosing such matters. Failure to do so will result in denial of the pro hac vice motion. (kc) |
||
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 08/09 1:14 PM
MOTION for attorney Benjamin S. Levine to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4138207) by James Leonard, II. (McKoon, James) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 08/09 1:13 PM
MOTION for attorney Rachael Luken Carp to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4138204) by James Leonard, II. (McKoon, James) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
27
pgs
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 08/08 4:55 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kroll, LLC, filed by Kroll, LLC.(Tom, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Kroll Acceptable Use of Assets Policy_Updated October 2023, | ||
Att: 2 3 pgs Exhibit Leonard Offer Letter Agreement, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Jim Leonard - HR offboarding, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Press Release | ||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Thu 08/08 2:56 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for James R. McKoon admitted to this court . (kc) |
||
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 08/07 3:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James R. McKoon on behalf of James Leonard, II (McKoon, James) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 07/31 12:58 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kroll, LLC. James Leonard, II waiver sent on 7/29/2024. (Tom, Robert) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 07/29 4:20 PM
ORDER granting7 and8 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for James S. Yu and Matthew C. Catalano to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 07/29/2024. (lh) |
|
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 07/29 3:29 PM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 7/29/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (hb) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 07/26 4:56 PM
MOTION for attorney Matthew C. Catalano to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4129068) by Kroll, LLC.(Tom, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing | ||
7 | 7
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 07/26 4:53 PM
MOTION for attorney James S. Yu to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4129064) by Kroll, LLC.(Tom, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Case Management Conference
Fri 07/26 10:36 AM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 10/29/2024 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (am) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/26 10:35 AM
Summons issued as to James Leonard, II. Counsel is responsible for printing and serving the summons after it is issued by the Clerk's Office. (am) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Admin Order 217
Fri 07/26 10:34 AM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (am) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ
Fri 07/26 10:33 AM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am) |
|
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Fri 07/26 10:38 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Robert F. Tom, Christopher J. Barrett admitted to this court . (am) |
||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Fri 07/26 10:39 AM
NY State Bar status verified as active for James S. Yu, Matthew Catalano not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured . (am) |
||
misc
Annotation - PHV
Fri 07/26 10:40 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL James S. Yu, Matthew Catalano: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 8/16/2024. (am) |
||
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Business Entity Disclosure Statement
Fri 07/26 10:27 AM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kroll, LLC. (am) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/26 10:27 AM
COMPLAINT against James Leonard, II (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4128255), filed by Kroll, LLC.(am) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit - A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit - B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit - C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit - D, | ||
Att: 5 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet |