Fernando Fontanez v. Federal Reserve, et al
Original Case: 1:24-mc-00077
D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cvus-05178 |
Type | civil us / united states |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Case Filed: | Jul 26, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 29, 2024 4:15 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Federal Reserve
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Jerome H. Powell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Fernando Fontanez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/29/2024 4:15 AM EDT |
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
US CIVIL CASE docketed. 24-5178 | ||
CERTIFIED AND FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [2066876] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7021 0350 0001 9947 8189] of order [2066872-4]. Certified Mail Receipt due 08/26/2024 from Fernando Fontanez. 24-5178 | ||
6 pgs NOTICE OF APPEAL [2066869] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:24-mc-00077-UNA filed by Fernando Fontanez. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 24-5178 24-5178 | ||
2 pgs CLERK'S ORDER [2066872] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 09/16/2024. APPENDIX due 09/16/2024. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. 24-5178 |