Taylor et al v. Yellen et al
Utah District Court | |
Judge: | Ann Marie Mciff Allen |
Referred: | Dustin B Pead |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00527 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:2201 Injunction |
Case Filed: | Jul 29, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Sep 13, 2024 3:59 AM MDT |
Defendant
Financial Crimes Enforcement Network
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Andrea Gacki
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Merrick Garland
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U.S. Department of the Treasury
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janet Yellen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Crofter Market LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ranchers Cattlemen Action Legal Fund United Stockgrowers of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Phillip Taylor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The People Restored
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The People Restored Foundation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The People Restored LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Utah OSR Land Cooperative
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/25/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Wednesday, September 18, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Order on Motion for Hearing
Wed 09/18 1:45 PM
ORDER granting 28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and Motion for Hearing. Defendants will file their response to the 20 motion, along with their response to Plaintiffs' complaint, no later than October 15, 2024. Plaintiffs will file their reply to Defendants' response no later than November 19, 2024. The motion will be heard by the Court on December 19, 2024, beginning at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 9/18/2024. (mh) |
|
misc
Modification of Docket
Wed 09/18 1:40 PM
Modification of Docket re28 MOTION: Error: Pleading filed under Motion for Scheduling Order. Pleading requests a hearing and an extension to respond/reply. Correction: Pleading motion event corrected to, Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and adding event MOTION for Hearing. Text updated. No further action needed. (mh) |
||
notice
Notice of Hearing on Motion
Wed 09/18 1:51 PM
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re:20 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support : (Notice generated by Clerk's Office) Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2024 at 10:00 AM in Rm 7.100 before Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead per30 Order. (mh) |
||
utility
Terminate Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 09/18 1:57 PM
DeMotion Hearing set for 12/19/2024 at 10:00 AM in Rm 7.100 before Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead per 30 Order terminated. Hearing erroneously entered. (mh) |
||
notice
Notice of Hearing on Motion
Wed 09/18 1:59 PM
Corrected NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re:20 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support : (Notice generated by Clerk's Office). Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2024 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Ann Marie McIff Allen. (mh) |
||
Tuesday, September 17, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Scheduling Order
Tue 09/17 6:10 PM
MOTION for Scheduling Order filed by Defendants Financial Crimes Enforcement Network, Andrea Gacki, Merrick Garland, U.S. Department of the Treasury, Janet Yellen. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Nelson, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 08/30 3:37 PM
ORDER granting 26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendants' response to the 20 Motion for Preliminary Injunction shall be filed by September 17, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/30/2024. (mh) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 08/30 2:20 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to20 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Financial Crimes Enforcement Network, Andrea Gacki, Merrick Garland, U.S. Department of the Treasury, Janet Yellen. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead. Attorney Jeffrey E. Nelson added to party Financial Crimes Enforcement Network(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey E. Nelson added to party Andrea Gacki(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey E. Nelson added to party Merrick Garland(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey E. Nelson added to party U.S. Department of the Treasury(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey E. Nelson added to party Janet Yellen(pty:dft)(Nelson, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 08/15 9:24 AM
ORDER granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendants' response to the 20 motion for a preliminary injunction shall be filed by September 9, 2024 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/15/2024. (mh) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 08/14 5:06 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to20 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Financial Crimes Enforcement Network, Andrea Gacki, Merrick Garland, U.S. Department of the Treasury, Janet Yellen. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead. Attorney Amanda A. Berndt added to party Financial Crimes Enforcement Network(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda A. Berndt added to party Andrea Gacki(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda A. Berndt added to party Merrick Garland(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda A. Berndt added to party U.S. Department of the Treasury(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda A. Berndt added to party Janet Yellen(pty:dft)(Berndt, Amanda) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
6
pgs
order
Order to Propose Schedule
Wed 07/31 11:28 AM
ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 7/31/2024. (haa) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Tue 07/30 10:45 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate Judge to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Ann Marie McIff Allen on 7/30/2024. (pjd) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/30 10:51 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jared M. Haynie for Crofter Market LLC,Jared M. Haynie for Ranchers Cattlemen Action Legal Fund United Stockgrowers of America,Jared M. Haynie for Phillip Taylor,Jared M. Haynie for The People Restored,Jared M. Haynie for The People Restored Foundation,Jared M. Haynie for The People Restored LLC,Jared M. Haynie for Utah OSR Land Cooperative. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.A Pro Hac Vice Attorney who fails to register for CM/ECF access will not receive notifications of electronic filings. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge Ann Marie McIff Allen on 7/30/2024. No attached document. (mh) |
||
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Mon 07/29 1:01 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs Crofter Market LLC, Ranchers Cattlemen Action Legal Fund United Stockgrowers of America, Phillip Taylor, The People Restored, The People Restored Foundation, The People Restored LLC, Utah OSR Land Cooperative.(Hepworth, Austin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Text of Proposed Order | ||
19 | 19
service
Summons Issued Electronically
Mon 07/29 12:53 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to The United States of America U.S. Department of Justice. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)
Mon 07/29 12:53 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jared M. Haynie , Registration fee $ 50, receipt number AUTDC-5137246, Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at[LINK:https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html] . Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at[LINK:https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing] . filed by Plaintiffs Crofter Market LLC, Ranchers Cattlemen Action Legal Fund United Stockgrowers of America, Phillip Taylor, The People Restored, The People Restored Foundation, The People Restored LLC, Utah OSR Land Cooperative.(Hepworth, Austin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Application, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
17 | 17
service
Summons Issued Electronically
Mon 07/29 12:52 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Trina A. Higgins United States Attorney for the District of Utah. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg) |
|
16 | 16
service
Summons Issued Electronically
Mon 07/29 12:51 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to U.S. Department of the Treasury. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg) |
|
15 | 15
service
Summons Issued Electronically
Mon 07/29 12:51 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Merrick Garland. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg) |
|
14 | 14
service
Summons Issued Electronically
Mon 07/29 12:50 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Janet Yellen. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg) |
|
13 | 13
service
Summons Issued Electronically
Mon 07/29 12:50 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Financial Crimes Enforcement Network. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg) |
|
12 | 12
service
Summons Issued Electronically
Mon 07/29 12:50 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Andrea Gacki. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Rule 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Atty)
Mon 07/29 12:38 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiffs Crofter Market LLC, Ranchers Cattlemen Action Legal Fund United Stockgrowers of America, Phillip Taylor, The People Restored, The People Restored Foundation, The People Restored LLC, Utah OSR Land Cooperative identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Hepworth, Austin) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice PHV Requirements
Mon 07/29 12:35 PM
NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance Pro Hac Vice emailed to attorney Jared Haynie for Crofter Market LLC, Ranchers Cattlemen Action Legal Fund United Stockgrowers of America, Phillip Taylor, The People Restored, The People Restored Foundation, The People Restored LLC, Utah OSR Land Cooperative (sg) |
|
9 | 9
service
Request Summons
Mon 07/29 12:32 PM
Requested Summons as to Merrick Garland. (Hepworth, Austin) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction
Mon 07/29 12:32 PM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice emailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Crofter Market LLC, Ranchers Cattlemen Action Legal Fund United Stockgrowers of America, Phillip Taylor, The People Restored, The People Restored Foundation, The People Restored LLC, Utah OSR Land Cooperative. (Notice generated by Clerk's Office) Form due by 8/19/2024. (sg) |
|
7 | 7
service
Request Summons
Mon 07/29 12:32 PM
Requested Summons as to U.S. Department of the Treasury. (Hepworth, Austin) |
|
6 | 6
service
Request Summons
Mon 07/29 12:29 PM
Requested Summons as to U.S. Department of the Treasury. (Hepworth, Austin) |
|
5 | 5
service
Request Summons
Mon 07/29 12:28 PM
Requested Summons as to Merrick Garland. (Hepworth, Austin) |
|
4 | 4
service
Request Summons
Mon 07/29 12:27 PM
Requested Summons as to Janet Yellen. (Hepworth, Austin) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request Summons
Mon 07/29 12:25 PM
Requested Summons as to Financial Crimes Enforcement Network. (Hepworth, Austin) |
|
2 | 2
service
Request Summons
Mon 07/29 12:24 PM
Requested Summons as to Andrea Gacki. (Hepworth, Austin) |
|
1 | 1
31
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Atty)
Mon 07/29 12:13 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AUTDC-5137130) filed by Crofter Market LLC, The People Restored Foundation, Utah OSR Land Cooperative, The People Restored LLC, Phillip Taylor, The People Restored, Ranchers Cattlemen Action Legal Fund United Stockgrowers of America. (Hepworth, Austin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 07/29 12:31 PM
Judge Ann Marie McIff Allen added. Case number will now read 2:24-cv-00527-AMA. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (sg) |