New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Pamela K Chen
Referred: Joseph A Marutollo
Case #: 1:24-cv-05287
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jul 29, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jan 25, 2025 4:24 AM EST
Defendant
DEO Medical Services, P.C.
Defendant
Healthwise Medical Associates, P.C.
Defendant
Dominic Emeka Onyema, M.D.
Plaintiff
GEICO Casualty Company
Represented By
Michael A. Sirignano
Rivkin, Radler LLP
contact info
Barry I. Levy
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Sean Patrick Gorton
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Nadia Udeshi
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By
Michael A. Sirignano
Rivkin, Radler LLP
contact info
Barry I. Levy
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Sean Patrick Gorton
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Nadia Udeshi
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GEICO Indemnity Company
Represented By
Michael A. Sirignano
Rivkin, Radler LLP
contact info
Barry I. Levy
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Sean Patrick Gorton
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Nadia Udeshi
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Government Employees Insurance Company
Represented By
Michael A. Sirignano
Rivkin, Radler LLP
contact info
Barry I. Levy
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Sean Patrick Gorton
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Nadia Udeshi
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 24 minutes ago
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
26 26 service Affidavit of Service Wed 11/20 6:10 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Motion for Default Judgment served on Dominic Emeka Onyema, M.D., DEO Medical Services, P.C., and Healthwise Medical Associates, P.C. on November 19, 2024, filed by Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company. (Gorton, Sean)
Related: [-]
order Order Referring Motion Wed 11/20 9:44 AM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION: Plaintiffs'25 Motion for Default Judgment is respectfully referred to the Honorable Joseph A. Marutollo. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 11/20/2024. (MLB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
25 25 motion Default Judgment Tue 11/19 2:42 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment by Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company. (Gorton, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Sean Gorton, Esq.,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Executed Confession of Judgment,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Executed Confession of Judgment,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Installment Payments issued by Defaulting Defendants,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - Default Notice dated February 21, 2024 with Proof of Service,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 - Certificate from the United States Department of Defense Manpower Data Center,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 - Proposed Judgment,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 - Clerk's Certificates of Default,
Att: 10 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b)(2)
Monday, October 07, 2024
24 24 misc Status Report Mon 10/07 3:52 PM
STATUS REPORT Pursuant to the September 18, 2024 Order by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (Gorton, Sean)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
23 23 service Certificate of Service Tue 10/01 3:33 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company re14 Request for Certificate of Default, Certificate regarding Undeliverable Mailing to DEO Medical Services, P.C. (Gorton, Sean)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
order Scheduling Order Wed 09/25 3:12 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Clerk having noted default, Plaintiff is directed to move for default by 11/25/2024. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 9/25/2024. (FG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
22 22 order Clerks Entry of Default Tue 09/24 1:45 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant DEO Medical Services, P.C. has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant DEO Medical Services, P.C. is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (JP)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Clerks Entry of Default Tue 09/24 1:40 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Healthwise Medical Associates, P.C. has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Healthwise Medical Associates, P.C. is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (JP)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Clerks Entry of Default Tue 09/24 1:35 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Dominic Emeka Onyema, MD has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Dominic Emeka Onyema, MD is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (JP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
19 19 service Affidavit of Service Thu 09/19 12:16 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Request for Certificate of Default with Affidavit in Support served on Healthwise Medical Associates, P.C. on September 18, 2024, filed by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Gorton, Sean)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Affidavit of Service Thu 09/19 12:15 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Request for Certificate of Default with Affidavit in Support served on DEO Medical Services, P.C. on September 18, 2024, filed by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Gorton, Sean)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Affidavit of Service Thu 09/19 12:14 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Request for Certificate of Default with Affidavit in Support served on Dominic Emeka Onyema, M.D. on September 18, 2024, filed by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Gorton, Sean)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
16 16 motion Adjourn Conference Wed 09/18 4:08 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference Letter Requesting Adjournment of the September 26, 2024 Initial Conference Sine Die by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Gorton, Sean)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Request for Certificate of Default Wed 09/18 11:16 AM
Request for Certificate of Default by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (Gorton, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of Request for Certificate of Default as to Healthwise Medical Associates, P.C.
14 14 misc Request for Certificate of Default Wed 09/18 11:15 AM
Request for Certificate of Default by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (Gorton, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of Request for Certificate of Default as to DEO Medical Services, P.C.
13 13 misc Request for Certificate of Default Wed 09/18 11:13 AM
Request for Certificate of Default by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (Gorton, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of Request for Certificate of Default as to Dominic Emeka Onyema, M.D.,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Manpower
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Wed 09/18 10:54 PM
ORDER granting16 - The initial conference is adjourned sine die. Plaintiff shall file a status report by October 7, 2024 regarding proposed next steps. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 9/18/2024. (JAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 09/09 2:36 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company. DEO Medical Services, P.C. served on 8/22/2024, answer due 9/12/2024. (Gorton, Sean)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 09/09 2:28 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company. Healthwise Medical Associates, P.C. served on 8/22/2024, answer due 9/12/2024. (Gorton, Sean)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 09/09 2:27 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company. Dominic Emeka Onyema, MD served on 8/23/2024, answer due 9/13/2024. (Gorton, Sean)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
8 8 order Scheduling Order Tue 07/30 2:33 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial conference will be held via telephone on September 26, 2024 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo. The parties can access the conference by dialing (646) 828 -7666 and entering meeting ID 160 253 7340 and passcode 864586. The parties must complete the attached proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order and file it on ECF no later than September 20, 2024. Plaintiff is directed to ensure that Defendants are aware of this conference. Counsel with knowledge of the case must attend the conference; per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. The parties are directed to review this Court's Individual Practices and Rules in advance of the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 7/30/2024. (LCPL)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/30 10:28 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nadia Udeshi on behalf of GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Udeshi, Nadia)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/30 10:21 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Sirignano on behalf of GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Sirignano, Michael)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/30 10:18 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Barry I. Levy on behalf of GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Levy, Barry)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 07/30 9:49 AM
Summons Issued as to DEO Medical Services, P.C., Healthwise Medical Associates, P.C., Dominic Emeka Onyema, MD. (CV)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Tue 07/30 9:47 AM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (CV)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 07/30 9:47 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CV)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 07/29 4:56 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent GEICO Corporation, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Gorton, Sean)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 07/29 4:55 PM
COMPLAINT against DEO Medical Services, P.C., Healthwise Medical Associates, P.C., Dominic Emeka Onyema, MD filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18116738 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed - No,, filed by Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company. (Gorton, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons and Rider,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agreement,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 - February 21, 2024 Letter Notice with Proof of Service