New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Andrew B Altenburg Jr
Case #: 1:24-bk-17484
Case Filed:Jul 29, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Apr 25, 2025

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
FASTLINE CARGO, LLC d/b/a FLC
1403 Industrial Highway
Cinnaminson, NJ 08077
Represented By
Ellen M. McDowell
Mcdowell Law, PC
contact info
McDowell Law, PC
contact info
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 26, 2025 5:26 PM EDT
Creditor
RTS Financial Service, Inc.
1810 Chapel Avenue W
Cherry Hill, NJ 08002
Represented By
Harry J. Giacometti
Flaster/greenberg, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
BMO BANK N.A.
320 S. Canal
Chicago, IL 60606
Represented By
James Kevin Haney
Wong Fleming, PC
contact info
Creditor
U.S. Bank N.A. d/b/a U.S. Bank Equipment Finance
1310 Madrid Street
Marshall, MN 56258
Represented By
Charles A. Gruen
contact info
Creditor
Amritraj Singh
525 Route 73 N, Ste 104
Marlton, NJ 08053
Represented By
Ira Deiches
Deiches & Ferschmann
contact info
Creditor
Santander Bank, N.A.
1040 Kings Highway N., Suite 100
Cherry Hill, NJ 08034
Represented By
Rebecca K. McDowell
Saldutti Law Group
contact info
Robert L. Saldutti
Saldutti Law Group
contact info
Creditor
Provident Bank
Attn.: William L. Waldman One Newark Center, 10th FL 1085 Raymond Boulevard
Newark, NJ 07102
Represented By
William L. Waldman
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Creditor
Phoenixville Federal Bank & Trust
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel LLP 1120 Route 73, Suite 420
Mount Laurel, NJ 08054
Represented By
Edmond M. George
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Creditor
PACCAR Financial Corp.
821 Alexander Road Suite 200
Princeton, NJ 08540
Represented By
James K. Haney
Wong Fleming, P.C.
contact info
James Kevin Haney
Wong Fleming, PC
contact info
Creditor
Amanjot Kaur
525 Route 73 N, Ste 104
Marlton, NJ 08053
Represented By
Ira Deiches
Deiches & Ferschmann
contact info
Creditor
FULTON BANK, N.A.
Represented By
Jerrold S. Kulback
Archer & Greiner, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Commercial Credit Group Inc.
Represented By
Michael Fj Romano
Romano & Garubo, Counselors At Law
contact info
Interested Party
Bryan Ortiz
Represented By
Brett W. Wiltsey
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Rodolfo Ramirez
Represented By
Joseph J. DiPasquale
Fox Rothschild, LLP
contact info
Kyle C. Herbert
Herbert Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Interested Party
Fidel Rojas Jr.
Represented By
Brett W. Wiltsey
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Lluvia Soto
Represented By
Brett W. Wiltsey
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Maria C. Soto
Represented By
Brett W. Wiltsey
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Maria F. Soto
Represented By
Brett W. Wiltsey
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Cielo Terrazas
Represented By
Brett W. Wiltsey
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Heidy Terrazas
Represented By
Brett W. Wiltsey
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel LLP
contact info
Spec. Counsel
Kyle C. Herbert
3411 Richmond Avenue, Suite 400
Houston, TX 77046
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
US Dept of Justice Office of the US Trustee One Newark Center Ste 2100
Newark, NJ 07102
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Sponder
Office Of U.S. Trustee
contact info
Kevin Callahan
Doj-Ust
contact info
Kevin P. Callahan
United States Department Of Justice
contact info


Docket last updated: 40 minutes ago
Sunday, April 27, 2025
153 153 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Mon 04/28 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/27/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
152 152 court BNC Ntc Order Confirm Plan Mon 04/28 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Confirming Plan No. of Notices: 46. Notice Date 04/27/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
151 151 order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan Fri 04/25 12:39 PM
Order Confirming Debtor/Plan Proponent's Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 4/25/2025. (har)
Related: [-] 138 Chapter 11 Plan filed by Debtor FASTLINE CARGO, LLC d/b/a FLC,140 Order Conditionally Approving Disclosure Statement
Thursday, April 24, 2025
court Hearing Held Thu 04/24 2:48 PM
Minute of 4/24/2025 Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Confirmed and approved; OTBS. Related [+] (as)
Related: [-] 140 Order Conditionally Approving Disclosure Statement (related document:138 Chapter 11 Plan filed by Debtor FASTLINE CARGO, LLC d/b/a FLC,139 Disclosure Statement filed by Debtor FASTLINE CARGO, LLC d/b/a FLC). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 3/11/2025. Confirmation hearing to be held on 4/24/2025 at 10:00 AM at ABA - Courtroom 4B, Camden. Last day to Object to Confirmation 4/17/2025.
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
150 150 misc Document Wed 04/23 3:04 PM
Document re: Stipulation of Debtor Pursuant to 11 USC 1129 of the Bankruptcy Code Related [+] filed by Ellen M. McDowell on behalf of FASTLINE CARGO, LLC d/b/a FLC. (McDowell, Ellen)
Related: [-] 138 Chapter 11 Plan filed by Debtor FASTLINE CARGO, LLC d/b/a FLC
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, April 21, 2025
149 149 misc Certification of Balloting Mon 04/21 11:41 AM
Certification of Balloting re: Related [+] filed by Ellen M. McDowell on behalf of FASTLINE CARGO, LLC d/b/a FLC. (McDowell, Ellen)
Related: [-] 138 Chapter 11 Plan filed by Debtor FASTLINE CARGO, LLC d/b/a FLC
Att: 1 Exhibit A