New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Gary R Brown
Referred: Arlene R Lindsay
Case #: 2:24-cv-05290
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jul 29, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jan 25, 2025 4:25 AM EST
Defendant
South Shore Rehabilitation, LLC
Represented By
Joan M. Gilbride
Kaufman Borgeest & Ryan, LLP
contact info
Hailey Kaye
Kaufman Borgeest & Ryan, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Palermo
Represented By
Abdul Karim Hassan
Abdul Hassan Law Group, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 02/19 10:32 AM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The parties are referred to meditation which shall be completed by April 4, 2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 2/19/2025. (BJ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Document Tue 02/18 10:23 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Complete Mediation, etc. by Michael Palermo. (Hassan, Abdul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
adr Selection of Mediator Wed 02/12 4:01 PM
SELECTION OF MEDIATOR Rhonda Epstein selected as Mediator. Date Time and Location in-person/remote: March 19, 2025. Fourteen days on or before the session date, counsel shall file with the Mediator their client's mediation statement summarizing the facts, legal issues, particulars of any prior settlement discussions, and the name and title of the client or client representative with full settlement authority who will attend the mediation. For more details on the submission, please consult Local Civil Rule 83.8(b)(4). Attendance is required of the trial attorney, insurance adjuster, and client or client representative with full settlement authority. The Confidentiality Stipulation (in-person or remote) must be signed at or before the initial mediation session by all participants and the Mediator and returned via e-mail to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov. The Mediators contact information can be found on the docket sheet. Within fourteen days of the conclusion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report. (JR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
order Order on Motion to Request Mediation Wed 12/18 2:04 PM
ORDER granting11 : The parties are referred to meditation which shall be completed by February 18, 2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 12/18/2024. c/ecf (RI)
Related: [-]
adr Mediation Instructions Wed 12/18 6:33 PM
MEDIATION INSTRUCTIONS: Mediation instructions for counsel are available[LINK:on the Court's website] . Counsel should select a mediator and schedule the initial mediation session with their chosen mediator. Once scheduled, counsel must file their selection using the [LINK:Selection of Mediator Form] . A list of EDNY Panel Mediators is available on the [LINK:Court's website] . EDNY Mediators are compensated in accordance with [LINK:EDNY Mediators are compensated in accordance with Local Civil Rule 83.8(f)(1)] . The Confidentiality Stipulation [LINK:in-person] or [LINK:remote] must be signed at or before the initial mediation session by all participants and the Mediator and returned via e-mail to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a [LINK:Mediation Report] to the ADR Department. (DS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
11 11 misc Status Report Tue 12/17 9:59 PM
STATUS REPORT and Request for Referral to EDNY Mediation Program by Michael Palermo (Hassan, Abdul)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
10 10 order Scheduling Order Mon 09/23 3:55 PM
FLSA INITIAL DISCOVERY and MEDIATION ORDER: See the attached Order for details.(Status Report due by 12/17/2024.) Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 9/23/2024. c/ecf (RI)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 09/23 12:04 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by All Defendants. (Gilbride, Joan)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 08/23 11:32 AM
ORDER re8 : The time for South Shore Rehabilitation, LLC to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to and including September 23, 2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 8/23/2024. c/ecf (RI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 08/22 11:41 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by South Shore Rehabilitation, LLC. (Gilbride, Joan)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/22 11:36 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Hailey Kaye on behalf of South Shore Rehabilitation, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Kaye, Hailey)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/22 11:23 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joan M. Gilbride on behalf of South Shore Rehabilitation, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Gilbride, Joan)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 03, 2024
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Sat 08/03 1:20 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Palermo. South Shore Rehabilitation, LLC served on 8/2/2024, answer due 8/23/2024. (Hassan, Abdul)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 07/30 9:03 AM
Summons Issued as to South Shore Rehabilitation, LLC. (CG)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Tue 07/30 8:58 AM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (CG)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Tue 07/30 8:54 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (CG)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 07/30 8:57 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CG)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 07/29 9:00 PM
COMPLAINT against South Shore Rehabilitation, LLC filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18117317 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Michael Palermo. (Hassan, Abdul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons