Roger J. Dahlby v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-04202 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 30, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Sep 13, 2024 6:20 AM EDT |
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
DuPont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Amercas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Roger J. Dahlby
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Tue 07/30 2:25 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 07/30/2024), Roger J. Dahlby v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-04202-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Kansas (mbon) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/30 2:24 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (mbon) |
|
1 | 1
46
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/30 2:23 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11905405.), filed by Roger J. Dahlby. Service due by 10/28/2024 (mbon) |