Batista-Rivera v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-04195 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 30, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Puerto Rico, 3:24-cv-01254 |
Last checked: Friday Sep 13, 2024 6:21 AM EDT |
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Innotex Corp
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
LN Curtis & Sons
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
MSA Safety Inc
|
|
Defendant
Milliken & Company
|
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Nation Ford Chemical Company 2300 Banks Street
Fort Mill, SC 29715 |
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
|
|
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions LP
|
|
Defendant
Ricochet Manufacturing Co Inc
|
|
Defendant
Safety Components Fabric Technologies Inc
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc
|
|
Defendant
Stedfast USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Veridian Limited
|
|
Defendant
W L Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Defendant
Witmer Public Safety Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
3M Center
St. Paul, MN 55133 |
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment Co
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
CB Garment Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Fire & Security Americas Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
13995 Pasteur Blvd.
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418 |
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
Agent Schok K. Moza 12321 Hatcherville
Baytown, TX 77520 |
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
|
Defendant
EIDP Inc
|
|
Defendant
Fire Service Plus Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Celso Batista Rivera
Barrio Molina HC8 BOX 2761
Saban Grande, PR 00637 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Wed 09/04 4:13 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Service due by 12/3/2024 (sshe, ) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order
Wed 09/04 4:13 PM
TEXT ORDER For good cause shown, service due is extended and calculated from the issuance of the summons. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 9/4/2024. (sshe, ) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Tue 07/30 3:33 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: District of Puerto Rico, 3:24-cv-01254, Batista-Rivera v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-4195-RMG (mbon) |
|
6 | 6
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Tue 07/30 3:14 PM
Case transferred in from District of Puerto Rico; Case Number 3:24-cv-01254. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
5 | 5 TRANSMITTAL Letter from the District of South Carolina, transferee court, with certified copy of CTO-198 in MDL 2873 and List of Tag-Along Actions. The Presiding Judge is the Honorable Richard M. Gergel. This case is hereby closed. (idg) [Transferred from Puerto Rico on 7/30/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Certified CTO, | ||
Att: 2 List of Tag-Along Actions | ||
4 | 4 E-MAIL NOTIFICATION from the MDL: Minute Order to all involved clerks informing that a transfer of this case to the District of South Carolina shall be effective when we receive a certified copy of the Transfer Order from the transferee court. (ab) [Transferred from Puerto Rico on 7/30/2024.] | |
3 | 3 E-MAIL NOTIFICATION RE: MDL 2873, informing that this case forms part of CTO-198 for transfer to the District of South Carolina and that the stay for CTO-198 has been lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Marcella Lockert on 7/3/2024. (ab) [Transferred from Puerto Rico on 7/30/2024.] | |
Att: 1 CTO-198, | ||
Att: 2 Tag Along Actions | ||
Wednesday, June 05, 2024 | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon. (vrg) [Transferred from Puerto Rico on 7/30/2024.] | |
Tuesday, June 04, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $405 receipt number APRDC-8697782.), filed by Celso Batista Rivera. Service due by 9/3/2024, [Transferred from Puerto Rico on 7/30/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement Attachment Civil Cover Sheet Attorneys, | ||
Att: 3 Category Sheet Category Sheet |