KAMYSHEV v. YELLEN et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Richard J Leon |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02240 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 30, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 31, 2024 12:49 AM EDT |
Defendant
DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
|
|
Defendant
OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSET CONTROL
|
|
Defendant
BRADLEY SMITH
|
|
Defendant
JANET YELLEN
|
|
Plaintiff
DENIS KAMYSHEV
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/08 4:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Farhad R. Alavi on behalf of DENIS KAMYSHEV (Alavi, Farhad) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Fri 08/02 1:03 PM
SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, OFFICE OF FOREIGN ASSET CONTROL, BRADLEY SMITH, JANET YELLEN, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(zmtm) |
|
Att: 1 Notice and Consent | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 08/02 12:29 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (zmtm) |
||
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Sealed Document
Tue 07/30 9:44 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT filed by DENIS KAMYSHEV re1 Complaint, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Toossi, Amir) |
|
1 | 1
20
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/30 9:39 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-11060528) filed by DENIS KAMYSHEV.(Toossi, Amir) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons (Janet Yellen), | ||
Att: 3 Summons (Department of the Treasury), | ||
Att: 4 Summons (Bradley Smith), | ||
Att: 5 Summons (OFAC), | ||
Att: 6 Summons (Attorney General), | ||
Att: 7 Summons (U.S. Attorney) |