Texas Western District Court
Case #: 4:24-mj-00360
Case Filed:Jul 29, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 31, 2024 2:22 AM CDT
Defendant
Jesus Ortega Munoz (1)
Represented By
Jaime Escuder - FPD
Federal Public Defender, Txw
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Duty AUSA Pecos
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Kevin Cayton
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/31/2024 3:18 AM CDT
Thursday, July 25, 2024
Arrest of Jesus Ortega Munoz (jh1)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
ORAL ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: Bond set to No Bond as to Jesus Ortega Munoz by Judge David B. Fannin. (jh1)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge David B. Fannin as to Jesus Ortega Munoz. (jh1)
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David B. Fannin:Initial Appearance as to Jesus Ortega Munoz held on 7/29/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Preliminary/Detention Hearing set for 8/1/2024 09:30 AM in Pecos before Judge David B. Fannin,), SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Jesus Ortega Munoz, Oral Due Process Protections Act Warning given in Open Court as to Jesus Ortega Munoz (Court Reporter FTR-ALPINE.) (jh1)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Jaime Escuder - FPD for Jesus Ortega Munoz. Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (jh1)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY / DETENTION HEARING as to Jesus Ortega Munoz. Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (jh1)
Related: [-]
5 5 Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Jesus Ortega Munoz. Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (jh1)
Related: [-]
6 6 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Jesus Ortega Munoz. (jh1)
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Kevin Cayton appearing for USA. . Attorney Kevin Cayton added to party USA(pty:pla) (Cayton, Kevin)
Related: [-]