Dixon et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-04242 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1446pl Petition for Removal - Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 01, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 2:24-cv-00869 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 15, 2024 6:41 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Amercas Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
974 Centre Road
Wilmington, DE 19805 |
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions LP
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Alexander
#322054 Evans Correctional Institution 610 Highway 9 West
Bennettsville, SC 29512 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Alexander
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Allen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Andrews
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joshua Antoine
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Apgar
152953 Broad River Correctional Institution 4460 Broad River Road
Columbia, SC 29210 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amanda Autry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jess E Avila
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wayne Baker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wilhelm Baligad
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Barnes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roderick Andre Barrington
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jimmie Bartee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Barton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Bearden
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregory Beck
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kristine Otis Bergquist
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karen Elaine Betzag
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Bieling
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deputy Richard Black
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Opal Darlane Blackmon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Blanksma
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephanie Blevins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Braden
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alvie Edward Britt, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Benjy Bulluck, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kyle B Bushman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Butler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Butters
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frank Chisman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tony Eugene Coe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronnie Collins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Walter Collins
323 Stuyvesant Avenue
Brooklyn, NY 11233 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Conde
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Lee Conley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Connell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lee Conner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Coolbaugh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wayne Cox
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roy Crane
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nickey Lee Crider
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Walter Crist
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Cron
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Dale Currier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Danita Currin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LLoyd Curtis, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Billy Dailey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charlie Davis, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clarence Davis, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul C Davis, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Dearth
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard J Decker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shaun Deprez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Dickerman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carolyn Wade Dixon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Jerome Dixon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Phyllis Donohue
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Duffey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chris Duhaer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Katherine Dunaway
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Willis Edwards
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arthur Ellis, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Antwone Latrelle Elrod
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laverne Epps
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Estrada
Lexington County Detention Center PO Box 2019
Lexington, SC 29071 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carmen Faverito
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Fisher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Winton Forde
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenny Dean Fouts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terry French
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Friend
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Frye
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KEVIN GROVES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hector Gamez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fred Theodore Gibson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kody Glenn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Larry Goza
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Peter Guarino
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerry Guerra
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Allen Hall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Celina Hallman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nehemiah Hankins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Isom Harris, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Teal Jeffrey Hart
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Hartley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Hartrim
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tom Hartwig
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lawrence Hays
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jamie Heinig
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Zachary Alan Henry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose Hermosura, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shannon Marie Herrera
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Hodges
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Harry Sylvester Houston, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Hunter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Warden Richard Ives
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Billie James
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bill Jarrett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jake Jensen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Lee Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Branden Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wyman Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Zaccarie Joseph
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Solomon Juda
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Kanoa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shawn W Keating
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Kern
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Knoblock
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Kortlever
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Kulisek
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony M Labbate
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Lachance
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason Landsperger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Langill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward Larsen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ron Lee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Lefebvre
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gordon Lester
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nicholas James Lewis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Link
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Ronald Locklear
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael D Loggains
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lawrence Long
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Philip Long, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Michael Loomis
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Thu 08/01 2:37 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Northern (associated as of 8/1/2024), 2:24-cv-00869, Dixon et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-04242-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
5 | 5
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Thu 08/01 2:34 PM
Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 2:24-cv-00869. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of South Carolina for inclusion in MDL 2873; record electronically transferred to Clerk of Court in District of South Carolina. (KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 8/1/2024.] | |
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 TEXT ORDER. The court GRANTS2 . Defendants' responsive pleading deadline is extended to 28 days following the JPML issuing a decision on whether to transfer this action to MDL 2873. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 7/8/2024. (FNC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 8/1/2024.] | |
2 | 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings to the Complaint (Assented-To) by Chemguard Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP. (Taube, Gregory) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 8/1/2024.] | |
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 405, receipt_number AALNDC-4626971 (ALND reciept# B-12310). related document1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chemguard Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, AL, case number 01-CV-2024-902027.00., filed by Chemguard Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP.(AKD). (Taube, Gregory) Modified on 7/2/2024 (AKD). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 8/1/2024.] | ||
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chemguard Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, AL, case number 01-CV-2024-902027.00., filed by Chemguard Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP.(AKD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 8/1/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A |