Mahkewa et al v. United States of America et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Steven P Logan |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-08155 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:2674 Federal Tort Claims Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 02, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 16, 2024 1:45 AM MST |
Defendant
United States of America
|
|
Defendant
Unknown Parties
|
|
Plaintiff
Julian Mahkewa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Starlie Mahkewa
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
5
pgs
order
Order re Rule 12(b) Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 08/13 5:01 PM
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 8/13/24. (MJW) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Tue 08/06 6:30 AM
Summons Issued as to United States of America. (BAS) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Submitted
Mon 08/05 5:43 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Julian Mahkewa, Starlie Mahkewa. (Bradley, Colin) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)
Mon 08/05 2:53 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:2 Summons Submitted filed by Julian Mahkewa, Starlie Mahkewa. The submitted form cannot be issued because multiple parties to be served are listed on the same form. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please submit two separate forms (one for the U.S. Attorney General and one for the U.S. Attorney for the District of Arizona) using the following: Civil, Amended Pleadings and Service, Service of Process, Summons Submitted. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
New Case Opened
Mon 08/05 2:50 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number CAZDC-23316821. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CAZDC-08155-PCT-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Submitted
Mon 08/05 2:48 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Julian Mahkewa, Starlie Mahkewa. (submitted by Colin Bradley) (REK) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 08/05 2:44 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number CAZDC-23316821 filed by Starlie Mahkewa, Julian Mahkewa. (submitted by Colin Bradley)(REK) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |